Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3471266 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3471266



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 191
12.07.2019 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
25.06.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.06.2019 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 6
25.06.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 5
25.06.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
25.06.2019 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
11.06.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
20.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
27.02.2019 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 38
15.02.2019 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
11.02.2019 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 38
07.02.2019 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
07.02.2019 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
07.02.2019 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 20
06.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
06.02.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.02.2019 Confirmation of effective date of early entry Search / examination 1
11.01.2019 Annex Search / examination 5
11.01.2019 Annex Search / examination 7
11.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
11.01.2019 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
11.01.2019 Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) Search / examination 2
02.11.2018 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
17.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.10.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
17.10.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
17.10.2018 Description Search / examination 24
17.10.2018 Drawings Search / examination 5
17.10.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5