Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3471266


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.08.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.06.2019 Supplementary search report published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
21.06.2019 Change - classification published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
21.06.2019 Change - classification published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
22.03.2019 Change - request for examination published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
15.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
15.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
01.03.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
18.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
09.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
01.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
23.11.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
29.10.2018 Change - representative
29.10.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
17.10.2018 PCT data prior to European publication