Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470938

EP3470938 - SMART CONTROL METHOD AND SERVER FOR MULTIPLE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shenzhen Skyworth-RGB Electronic Co., Ltd.
13-16 F, Block A Skyworth Building
Shennan Road
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DING, Zhilin
13-16 F., Block A
Skyworth Building
Shennan Road
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Osterhoff, Utz
Bockermann Ksoll
Griepenstroh Osterhoff
Patentanwälte
Bergstraße 159
44791 Bochum / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17905859.920.12.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017CN117578
Priority number, dateCN20171024366613.04.2017         Original published format: CN201710243666
[2019/16]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018188372
Date:18.10.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470938
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN18.10.2018
ClassificationInternational:G05B15/02, H04L29/08
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:INTELLIGENTES STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND SERVER FÜR MEHRERE VORRICHTUNGEN[2019/16]
English:SMART CONTROL METHOD AND SERVER FOR MULTIPLE DEVICES[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE INTELLIGENTE ET SERVEUR DESTINÉS À DE MULTIPLES DISPOSITIFS[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2019Translation filed 
11.01.2019National basic fee paid 
11.01.2019Search fee paid 
11.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
11.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 03