Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474343

EP3474343 - THERMAL MANAGEMENT POWER BATTERY MODULE AND BATTERY PACK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 24.04.2019  [2019/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eve Energy Co., Ltd.
No.38, Huifeng 7th Road
Zhongkai Hi-Tech Zone
Huizhou, Guangdong 516006 / CN
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / JIANG, Jibing
No. 38 Huifeng 7th Road
Zhongkai Hi-Tech Zone
Huizhou Guangdong 516006 / CN
02 / FENG, Yanqiang
No. 38 Huifeng 7th Road
Zhongkai Hi-Tech Zone
Huizhou Guangdong 516006 / CN
03 / YUAN, Dingding
No. 38 Huifeng 7th Road
Zhongkai Hi-Tech Zone
Huizhou Guangdong 516006 / CN
04 / HUANG, Guomin
No. 38 Huifeng 7th Road
Zhongkai Hi-Tech Zone
Huizhou Guangdong 516006 / CN
05 / LIU, Jincheng
No. 38 Huifeng 7th Road
Zhongkai Hi-Tech Zone
Huizhou Guangdong 516006 / CN
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Cabinet Beaumont
4, Place Robert Schuman
B.P. 1529
38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17910025.018.12.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017CN116947
Priority number, dateCN20171034289716.05.2017         Original published format: CN201710342897
[2019/17]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018209950
Date:22.11.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474343
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN22.11.2018
ClassificationInternational:H01M2/10, H01M10/613, H01M10/617, H01M10/625, H01M10/653, H01M10/6567, H01M10/658
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:POWER-AKKUMODUL MIT WÄRMEVERWALTUNG UND AKKU-PACK[2019/17]
English:THERMAL MANAGEMENT POWER BATTERY MODULE AND BATTERY PACK[2019/17]
French:MODULE DE BATTERIE D'ALIMENTATION À GESTION THERMIQUE ET BLOC-BATTERIE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase16.01.2019Translation filed 
16.01.2019National basic fee paid 
16.01.2019Search fee paid 
16.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
16.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
16.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]