blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3647884

EP3647884 - CIRCUIT, METHOD AND RELATED CHIP FOR TIME MEASUREMENT, SYSTEM, AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.02.2023
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.03.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.11.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.08.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.04.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SZ DJI Technology Co., Ltd.
6HF, HKUST SZ IER Bldg.
No.9, Yuexing 1st Rd.
Hi-Tech Park (South)
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2021/35]
Former [2020/19]For all designated states
SZ DJI Technology Co., Ltd.
6F, Hkust SZ IER Bldg.
No.9, Yuexing 1st Road
Hi Tech Park (South)
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / GAO, Mingming
6HF, HKUST SZ IER Bldg.
No.9, Yuexing 1st Rd.
Hi-Tech Park (South)
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / YANG, Kang
6HF, HKUST SZ IER Bldg.
No.9, Yuexing 1st Rd.
Hi-Tech Park (South)
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
03 / LIU, Xiang
6HF, HKUST SZ IER Bldg.
No.9, Yuexing 1st Rd.
Hi-Tech Park (South)
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2021/35]
Former [2020/19]01 / GAO, Mingming
6F Hkust Sz Ier Bldg.
No. 9 Yuexing 1st Rd.
Hi-tech Park(South)
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
02 / YANG, Kang
6F Hkust Sz Ier Bldg.
No. 9 Yuexing 1st Rd.
Hi-tech Park (South)
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
03 / LIU, Xiang
6F Hkust Sz Ier Bldg.
No. 9 Yuexing 1st Rd.
Hi-tech Park (South)
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
Representative(s)Appelt, Christian W., et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[2020/19]
Application number, filing date17916318.330.06.2017
[2020/19]
WO2017CN91048
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019000373
Date:03.01.2019
Language:ZH
[2019/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3647884
Date:06.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3647884
Date:13.04.2022
Language:EN
[2022/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN03.01.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.01.2021
ClassificationIPC:G04F10/00
[2020/19]
CPC:
G04F10/005 (EP,US); G01S17/88 (EP,CN,US); G01S7/4866 (US);
G01S7/48 (EP,CN); G01S7/484 (US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHALTUNG, VERFAHREN UND ZUGEHÖRIGER CHIP ZUR ZEITMESSUNG, SYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG[2020/19]
English:CIRCUIT, METHOD AND RELATED CHIP FOR TIME MEASUREMENT, SYSTEM, AND DEVICE[2020/19]
French:CIRCUIT, PROCÉDÉ ET PUCE CONNEXE POUR LA MESURE DU TEMPS, SYSTÈME, ET DISPOSITIF[2020/19]
Entry into regional phase27.12.2019Translation filed 
27.12.2019National basic fee paid 
27.12.2019Search fee paid 
27.12.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
27.12.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.12.2019Examination requested  [2020/19]
17.02.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.08.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
25.08.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.03.2022Fee for grant paid
02.03.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.03.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)16.01.2023No opposition filed within time limit [2023/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.06.2017
AL13.04.2022
AT13.04.2022
CY13.04.2022
CZ13.04.2022
DK13.04.2022
EE13.04.2022
ES13.04.2022
FI13.04.2022
HR13.04.2022
IT13.04.2022
LT13.04.2022
LV13.04.2022
MC13.04.2022
MK13.04.2022
NL13.04.2022
PL13.04.2022
RO13.04.2022
RS13.04.2022
SE13.04.2022
SI13.04.2022
SK13.04.2022
SM13.04.2022
BE30.06.2022
CH30.06.2022
FR30.06.2022
IE30.06.2022
LI30.06.2022
LU30.06.2022
BG13.07.2022
GB13.07.2022
NO13.07.2022
GR14.07.2022
IS13.08.2022
PT16.08.2022
[2024/24]
Former [2024/23]AL13.04.2022
AT13.04.2022
CY13.04.2022
CZ13.04.2022
DK13.04.2022
EE13.04.2022
ES13.04.2022
FI13.04.2022
HR13.04.2022
IT13.04.2022
LT13.04.2022
LV13.04.2022
MC13.04.2022
MK13.04.2022
NL13.04.2022
PL13.04.2022
RO13.04.2022
RS13.04.2022
SE13.04.2022
SI13.04.2022
SK13.04.2022
SM13.04.2022
BE30.06.2022
CH30.06.2022
FR30.06.2022
IE30.06.2022
LI30.06.2022
LU30.06.2022
BG13.07.2022
GB13.07.2022
NO13.07.2022
GR14.07.2022
IS13.08.2022
PT16.08.2022
Former [2024/20]AL13.04.2022
AT13.04.2022
CY13.04.2022
CZ13.04.2022
DK13.04.2022
EE13.04.2022
ES13.04.2022
FI13.04.2022
HR13.04.2022
IT13.04.2022
LT13.04.2022
LV13.04.2022
MC13.04.2022
NL13.04.2022
PL13.04.2022
RO13.04.2022
RS13.04.2022
SE13.04.2022
SI13.04.2022
SK13.04.2022
SM13.04.2022
BE30.06.2022
CH30.06.2022
FR30.06.2022
IE30.06.2022
LI30.06.2022
LU30.06.2022
BG13.07.2022
GB13.07.2022
NO13.07.2022
GR14.07.2022
IS13.08.2022
PT16.08.2022
Former [2024/11]AL13.04.2022
AT13.04.2022
CZ13.04.2022
DK13.04.2022
EE13.04.2022
ES13.04.2022
FI13.04.2022
HR13.04.2022
IT13.04.2022
LT13.04.2022
LV13.04.2022
MC13.04.2022
NL13.04.2022
PL13.04.2022
RO13.04.2022
RS13.04.2022
SE13.04.2022
SI13.04.2022
SK13.04.2022
SM13.04.2022
BE30.06.2022
CH30.06.2022
FR30.06.2022
IE30.06.2022
LI30.06.2022
LU30.06.2022
BG13.07.2022
GB13.07.2022
NO13.07.2022
GR14.07.2022
IS13.08.2022
PT16.08.2022
Former [2023/27]AL13.04.2022
AT13.04.2022
CZ13.04.2022
DK13.04.2022
EE13.04.2022
ES13.04.2022
FI13.04.2022
HR13.04.2022
LT13.04.2022
LV13.04.2022
MC13.04.2022
NL13.04.2022
PL13.04.2022
RO13.04.2022
RS13.04.2022
SE13.04.2022
SI13.04.2022
SK13.04.2022
SM13.04.2022
BE30.06.2022
CH30.06.2022
FR30.06.2022
IE30.06.2022
LI30.06.2022
LU30.06.2022
BG13.07.2022
GB13.07.2022
NO13.07.2022
GR14.07.2022
IS13.08.2022
PT16.08.2022
Former [2023/25]AL13.04.2022
AT13.04.2022
CZ13.04.2022
DK13.04.2022
EE13.04.2022
ES13.04.2022
FI13.04.2022
HR13.04.2022
LT13.04.2022
LV13.04.2022
MC13.04.2022
NL13.04.2022
PL13.04.2022
RO13.04.2022
RS13.04.2022
SE13.04.2022
SI13.04.2022
SK13.04.2022
SM13.04.2022
BE30.06.2022
CH30.06.2022
FR30.06.2022
IE30.06.2022
LI30.06.2022
LU30.06.2022
BG13.07.2022
NO13.07.2022
GR14.07.2022
IS13.08.2022
PT16.08.2022
Former [2023/22]AL13.04.2022
AT13.04.2022
CZ13.04.2022
DK13.04.2022
EE13.04.2022
ES13.04.2022
FI13.04.2022
HR13.04.2022
LT13.04.2022
LV13.04.2022
MC13.04.2022
NL13.04.2022
PL13.04.2022
RO13.04.2022
RS13.04.2022
SE13.04.2022
SK13.04.2022
SM13.04.2022
CH30.06.2022
FR30.06.2022
IE30.06.2022
LI30.06.2022
LU30.06.2022
BG13.07.2022
NO13.07.2022
GR14.07.2022
IS13.08.2022
PT16.08.2022
Former [2023/21]AL13.04.2022
AT13.04.2022
CZ13.04.2022
DK13.04.2022
EE13.04.2022
ES13.04.2022
FI13.04.2022
HR13.04.2022
LT13.04.2022
LV13.04.2022
MC13.04.2022
NL13.04.2022
PL13.04.2022
RO13.04.2022
RS13.04.2022
SE13.04.2022
SK13.04.2022
SM13.04.2022
CH30.06.2022
IE30.06.2022
LI30.06.2022
LU30.06.2022
BG13.07.2022
NO13.07.2022
GR14.07.2022
IS13.08.2022
PT16.08.2022
Former [2023/20]AL13.04.2022
AT13.04.2022
CZ13.04.2022
DK13.04.2022
EE13.04.2022
ES13.04.2022
FI13.04.2022
HR13.04.2022
LT13.04.2022
LV13.04.2022
MC13.04.2022
NL13.04.2022
PL13.04.2022
RO13.04.2022
RS13.04.2022
SE13.04.2022
SK13.04.2022
SM13.04.2022
IE30.06.2022
BG13.07.2022
NO13.07.2022
GR14.07.2022
IS13.08.2022
PT16.08.2022
Former [2023/17]AL13.04.2022
AT13.04.2022
CZ13.04.2022
DK13.04.2022
EE13.04.2022
ES13.04.2022
FI13.04.2022
HR13.04.2022
LT13.04.2022
LV13.04.2022
MC13.04.2022
NL13.04.2022
PL13.04.2022
RO13.04.2022
RS13.04.2022
SE13.04.2022
SK13.04.2022
SM13.04.2022
BG13.07.2022
NO13.07.2022
GR14.07.2022
IS13.08.2022
PT16.08.2022
Former [2023/09]AT13.04.2022
CZ13.04.2022
DK13.04.2022
EE13.04.2022
ES13.04.2022
FI13.04.2022
HR13.04.2022
LT13.04.2022
LV13.04.2022
MC13.04.2022
NL13.04.2022
PL13.04.2022
RO13.04.2022
RS13.04.2022
SE13.04.2022
SK13.04.2022
SM13.04.2022
BG13.07.2022
NO13.07.2022
GR14.07.2022
IS13.08.2022
PT16.08.2022
Former [2023/08]AT13.04.2022
DK13.04.2022
ES13.04.2022
FI13.04.2022
HR13.04.2022
LT13.04.2022
LV13.04.2022
MC13.04.2022
NL13.04.2022
PL13.04.2022
RS13.04.2022
SE13.04.2022
BG13.07.2022
NO13.07.2022
GR14.07.2022
IS13.08.2022
PT16.08.2022
Former [2023/07]AT13.04.2022
DK13.04.2022
ES13.04.2022
FI13.04.2022
HR13.04.2022
LT13.04.2022
LV13.04.2022
NL13.04.2022
PL13.04.2022
RS13.04.2022
SE13.04.2022
BG13.07.2022
NO13.07.2022
GR14.07.2022
IS13.08.2022
PT16.08.2022
Former [2022/51]AT13.04.2022
ES13.04.2022
FI13.04.2022
HR13.04.2022
LT13.04.2022
LV13.04.2022
NL13.04.2022
PL13.04.2022
RS13.04.2022
SE13.04.2022
BG13.07.2022
NO13.07.2022
GR14.07.2022
IS13.08.2022
PT16.08.2022
Former [2022/50]AT13.04.2022
ES13.04.2022
FI13.04.2022
HR13.04.2022
LT13.04.2022
LV13.04.2022
NL13.04.2022
PL13.04.2022
RS13.04.2022
SE13.04.2022
BG13.07.2022
NO13.07.2022
GR14.07.2022
PT16.08.2022
Former [2022/49]AT13.04.2022
ES13.04.2022
FI13.04.2022
HR13.04.2022
LT13.04.2022
LV13.04.2022
NL13.04.2022
SE13.04.2022
BG13.07.2022
NO13.07.2022
GR14.07.2022
PT16.08.2022
Former [2022/47]AT13.04.2022
ES13.04.2022
FI13.04.2022
LT13.04.2022
NL13.04.2022
SE13.04.2022
NO13.07.2022
PT16.08.2022
Former [2022/44]NL13.04.2022
Documents cited:Search[A]US2002093445  (WATANABE TAKAMOTO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0055]; figure 5 *;
 [A]US2007280054  (WATANABE TAKAMOTO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0049] * * figure 1A *;
 [A]WO2009021186  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0055] * * figures 2,6 *;
 [A]US8558728  (LEMKIN MARK ALAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 8, line 19 - column 9, line 45 ** figure 3c *
International search[A]CN1214478  (XI AN ELECTRONIC SCIENCE & TEC [CN]) [A] 1-17 * , description, paragraphs [0007] and [0008], and figure 1 *;
 [A]US2007280054  (WATANABE TAKAMOTO [JP]) [A] 1-17* , entire document *;
 [A]CN102882527  (SHANDONG OULONG ELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * , entire document *;
 [A]CN104216279  (XI AN HONGTAI TIME FREQUENCY) [A] 1-17 * , entire document *;
 [A]CN104714403  (BEIJING FUXING XIAOCHENG ELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY STOCK CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * , entire document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.