blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3653245

EP3653245 - SAFETY SYRINGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.11.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.04.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2021Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.12.2021  [2021/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hung, Chih-Hua
1F. no.54 ln.228 Dazhuang Rd.
Xiangshan Dist.
Hsinchu City 300 / TW
[2020/21]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2020/21]
Representative(s)Straus, Alexander
2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte - München
Keltenring 9
82041 Oberhaching / DE
[N/P]
Former [2020/21]Straus, Alexander
2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Alexander Straus
Keltenring 9
82041 München / Oberhaching / DE
Application number, filing date17917529.414.07.2017
[2020/21]
WO2017CN92891
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019010689
Date:17.01.2019
Language:ZH
[2019/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3653245
Date:20.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN17.01.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.2020
ClassificationIPC:A61M5/28, A61M5/31, A61M5/315, A61M5/32, A61M5/50, A61B5/15
[2021/01]
CPC:
A61M5/3245 (EP); A61M5/31505 (EP,US); A61B5/15003 (EP);
A61M5/19 (US); A61M5/3134 (EP,US); A61M5/3158 (US);
A61M5/50 (EP); A61B5/150641 (EP); A61B5/150916 (EP);
A61B5/153 (EP); A61M2005/3131 (EP,US); A61M2005/31506 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3247 (EP); A61M2005/3249 (EP); A61M2205/0216 (EP);
A61M2205/273 (EP); A61M5/281 (EP); A61M5/3275 (EP);
A61M5/5086 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2020/21]A61M5/50
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/21]
TitleGerman:SICHERHEITSSPRITZE[2020/21]
English:SAFETY SYRINGE[2020/21]
French:SERINGUE DE SÉCURITÉ[2020/21]
Entry into regional phase03.02.2020Translation filed 
14.01.2020National basic fee paid 
14.01.2020Search fee paid 
14.01.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.05.2019Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN
14.01.2020Examination requested  [2020/21]
02.07.2021Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2021/49]
26.07.2021Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2021/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.202105   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]CN2880124Y  (LIU HUALIN [CN]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [A] 6;
 [XA]US5338310  (LEWANDOWSKI RAYMOND D [US]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [A] 6;
 [XA]CN1689655  (LIU RONGE [CN]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [A] 6
International search[X]CN1689655  (LIU RONGE [CN]) [X] 1-6;
 [A]CN104548277  (WU GUO-CHENG) [A] 1-6;
 [A]CN1520891  (YANG ZHONGYU [CN]) [A] 1-6;
 [A]CN1977991  (XU MINGZHENG [CN]) [A] 1-6;
 [A]US4888002  (BRAGINETZ PAUL A [US], et al) [A] 1-6
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.