EP3661343 - SUBSTRATE PROCESSING MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2024 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2025 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 23.04.2025 [2025/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Corporation 19, Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-shi, Aichi 472-8686 / JP | [2020/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Toshiya c/o FUJI MACHINE MFG. CO. LTD. 19 Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-shi Aichi 472-8686 / JP | [2023/47] |
Former [2020/23] | 01 /
SUZUKI Toshiya c/o FUJI MACHINE MFG. CO. LTD. 19 Chausuyama Yamamachi Chiryu-shi Aichi 472-8686 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/23] | Application number, filing date | 17919346.1 | 25.07.2017 | [2020/23] | WO2017JP26790 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019021361 | Date: | 31.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3661343 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3661343 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/08 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
H05K13/083 (EP,US);
H05K13/0882 (EP,US);
G06T7/0004 (US);
H05K13/08 (EP);
H05K13/081 (US);
H05K13/0815 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBSTRATVERARBEITUNGVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/23] | English: | SUBSTRATE PROCESSING MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2020/23] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE TRAITEMENT DE SUBSTRAT | [2020/23] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2020 | Translation filed | 16.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/23] | 05.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2025/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2024 | BG | 14.02.2024 | CZ | 14.02.2024 | DK | 14.02.2024 | EE | 14.02.2024 | ES | 14.02.2024 | FI | 14.02.2024 | HR | 14.02.2024 | IT | 14.02.2024 | LT | 14.02.2024 | LV | 14.02.2024 | MC | 14.02.2024 | NL | 14.02.2024 | PL | 14.02.2024 | RO | 14.02.2024 | SE | 14.02.2024 | SK | 14.02.2024 | SM | 14.02.2024 | NO | 14.05.2024 | RS | 14.05.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | PT | 14.06.2024 | LU | 25.07.2024 | [2025/17] |
Former [2025/11] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2024 | ||
DK | 14.02.2024 | ||
EE | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
IT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LV | 14.02.2024 | ||
MC | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
PL | 14.02.2024 | ||
RO | 14.02.2024 | ||
SE | 14.02.2024 | ||
SK | 14.02.2024 | ||
SM | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
PT | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2025/02] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2024 | ||
DK | 14.02.2024 | ||
EE | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
IT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LV | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
PL | 14.02.2024 | ||
RO | 14.02.2024 | ||
SE | 14.02.2024 | ||
SK | 14.02.2024 | ||
SM | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
PT | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/49] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2024 | ||
DK | 14.02.2024 | ||
EE | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LV | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
PL | 14.02.2024 | ||
RO | 14.02.2024 | ||
SE | 14.02.2024 | ||
SK | 14.02.2024 | ||
SM | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
PT | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/48] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2024 | ||
DK | 14.02.2024 | ||
EE | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LV | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
PL | 14.02.2024 | ||
SE | 14.02.2024 | ||
SM | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
PT | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/47] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
DK | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LV | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
PL | 14.02.2024 | ||
SE | 14.02.2024 | ||
SM | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
PT | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/37] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LV | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
PL | 14.02.2024 | ||
SE | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
PT | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LV | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
PL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
PT | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 14.02.2024 | |
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 14.02.2024 | |
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10284900 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP2355646 (HITACHI HIGH TECH INSTR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0193]; figures 1,2,4-21 *; | [A]JP2012248815 (FUJI MACHINE MFG) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0083]; figures 1-5,8 *; | [A]EP2902861 (FUJI MACHINE MFG [JP]) [A] 1-7* paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0059]; figures 1-6 *; | [XI]EP2922380 (FUJI MACHINE MFG [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0071]; figures 1-6 * [I] 3,4,7 | International search | [A]JP2004214394 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2013168539 (FUJI MACHINE MFG) [A] 1-7 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2014076755 (FUJI MACHINE MFG [JP]) [A] 1-7* , & US 2015/0286202 A1 & EP 2922380 A1 & CN 104770081 A * | by applicant | JP2007157781 |