EP3661046 - DRIVE DEVICE, COMPRESSOR, AIR CONDITIONER, AND DRIVE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 18.12.2024 [2024/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2020/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIGO, Masahiro c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
HIROSAWA, Yuji c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2020/23] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2020/23] | Application number, filing date | 17919562.3 | 25.07.2017 | [2020/23] | WO2017JP26877 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019021373 | Date: | 31.01.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3661046 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3661046 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.01.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02P25/18, H02P27/08, H02P23/00 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
H02P25/184 (EP,KR);
H02P25/18 (US);
F24F13/00 (KR);
F25B31/026 (KR);
F25B49/025 (US);
H02K1/146 (US);
H02K1/26 (KR);
H02K1/276 (KR,US);
H02P21/0089 (KR);
H02P23/009 (EP);
H02P27/08 (EP,KR,US);
H02K2213/03 (KR);
H02P2207/05 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/23] | H02P25/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG, KOMPRESSOR, KLIMAANLAGE UND ANTRIEBSVERFAHREN | [2020/23] | English: | DRIVE DEVICE, COMPRESSOR, AIR CONDITIONER, AND DRIVE METHOD | [2020/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE, COMPRESSEUR, CLIMATISEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2023/06] |
Former [2020/23] | DISPOSITIF D'ATTAQUE, COMPRESSEUR, CLIMATISEUR ET PROCÉDÉ D'ATTAQUE | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2020 | Translation filed | 11.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/23] | 22.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.07.2023 | BG | 19.07.2023 | CZ | 19.07.2023 | DK | 19.07.2023 | EE | 19.07.2023 | ES | 19.07.2023 | FI | 19.07.2023 | HR | 19.07.2023 | IT | 19.07.2023 | LT | 19.07.2023 | LV | 19.07.2023 | MC | 19.07.2023 | NL | 19.07.2023 | PL | 19.07.2023 | RO | 19.07.2023 | RS | 19.07.2023 | SE | 19.07.2023 | SI | 19.07.2023 | SK | 19.07.2023 | SM | 19.07.2023 | IE | 25.07.2023 | LU | 25.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | FR | 19.09.2023 | NO | 19.10.2023 | GR | 20.10.2023 | IS | 19.11.2023 | PT | 20.11.2023 | [2024/51] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
IT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
MC | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SI | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
IE | 25.07.2023 | ||
LU | 25.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
FR | 19.09.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
IT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
MC | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
IE | 25.07.2023 | ||
LU | 25.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
FR | 19.09.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
IT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
MC | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
IE | 25.07.2023 | ||
LU | 25.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
IT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
MC | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
LU | 25.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
MC | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
LU | 25.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
LU | 25.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
LU | 25.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
LU | 25.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 19.07.2023 | |
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 19.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]JP2008228513 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [I] 1-6,8-15 * the whole document * [Y] 7; | [Y]WO2016051456 (JOHNSON CONTROLS HITACHI AIR CONDITIONING TECHNOLOGY HONG KONG LTD [CN]) [Y] 7* Steps 204, 205 Method of Mixing Y Connection and Delta Connection * | International search | [A]JPH0767390 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-14* , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2008228513 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-14 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012070531 (HITACHI APPLIANCES INC) [A] 1-14 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP4722069B |