EP3621357 - SERVICE ACCESS METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2020/11] | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jianhua No.18 Haibin Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2020/11] | Application number, filing date | 17920756.8 | 07.08.2017 | [2020/11] | WO2017CN96275 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019028609 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3621357 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.02.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/00, H04W48/18 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
H04W48/18 (EP,RU);
H04W40/22 (RU,US);
H04L45/302 (US);
H04W4/50 (US);
H04W40/28 (RU,US);
H04W48/00 (EP,RU);
|
Former IPC [2020/11] | H04W48/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] | Title | German: | DIENSTZUGANGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2020/11] | English: | SERVICE ACCESS METHOD AND DEVICE | [2020/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ACCÈS AU SERVICE | [2020/11] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2019 | Translation filed | 02.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/11] | 11.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2017063485 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | EP3322223 [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0012] - [0014] , [0019] , [0032] , [0043] , [0054] , [0055] , [0061] * * figures 1,2; claims 1-5 *; | [I]CN101453777 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP [CN]) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * page 3, line 21 - page 9, line 3 * * figure 4 *; | [I]WO2012092935 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * page 5, line 6 - page 23, line 2 * | International search | [X]CN101453777 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP [CN]) [X] 1-24; | [X]CN103052142 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP) [X] 1-24; | [X]WO2012092935 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-24; | [A]CN101662810 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP) [A] 1-24 |