EP3644166 - DISPLAY SCREEN AND MOBILE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Hu Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
HE, Haiming Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Chun Yen Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2020/18] | Application number, filing date | 17923807.6 | 31.08.2017 | [2020/18] | WO2017CN99950 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019041237 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3644166 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G09G3/32 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
G06F1/16 (EP);
G09G3/2092 (US);
G06F1/1626 (US);
G06F1/1632 (US);
G09G3/20 (EP);
H05K1/028 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/18] | G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEBILDSCHIRM UND MOBILES ENDGERÄT | [2020/18] | English: | DISPLAY SCREEN AND MOBILE TERMINAL | [2020/18] | French: | ÉCRAN D'AFFICHAGE ET TERMINAL MOBILE | [2020/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2020 | Translation filed | 21.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 30.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2021 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 04.11.2021 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 07.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2015071820 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB [JP]) [X] 1,2 * figures 2B, 4, 5, 6, 7 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0080] *[I] 3-10 | International search | [A]CN103325317 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , entire document *; | [A]US8829508 (PARK JIN-HEE [KR]) [A] 1-10* , entire document *; | [A]US2015028363 (LEE HEE KWON [KR]) [A] 1-10 * , entire document *; | [A]CN104952883 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , entire document *; | [A]CN105573654 (SHENZHEN GIONEE COMMUNICATION EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs [0023] and [0027], and figure 5 *; | [A]CN205539814U (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , entire document *; | [A]CN106502606 (HUAWEI MACHINERY CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , entire document * |