blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3676986

EP3676986 - SINGLE NODE MULTI-PARTY ENCRYPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.11.2022
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.12.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.08.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.06.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Visa International Service Association
P.O. Box 8999
San Francisco, CA 94128-8999 / US
[2020/28]
Inventor(s)01 / GRYB, Oleg
3527 Kirkham Street
San Francisco, California 94122 / US
02 / NAGASUNDARAM, Sekhar
1445 Bayberry View Lane
San Ramon, CA 94582 / US
 [2020/28]
Representative(s)EIP
Fairfax House
15 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HU / GB
[2022/03]
Former [2020/28]EIP
EIP Europe LLP
Fairfax House
15 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date17923881.131.08.2017
[2020/28]
WO2017US49722
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2019045741
Date:07.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3676986
Date:08.07.2020
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2020/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3676986
Date:19.01.2022
Language:EN
[2022/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR07.03.2019
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.08.2020
ClassificationIPC:H04L9/08, H04L9/14, G06F21/57, G06F21/62
[2020/36]
CPC:
G06F21/6218 (EP,US); H04L9/0869 (US); G06F21/575 (EP,US);
H04L9/085 (EP,US); H04L9/0861 (EP); H04L9/0894 (EP);
H04L9/14 (US); G06F2221/2107 (EP,US); H04L2209/16 (EP);
H04L2209/46 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2020/28]H04L9/08, H04L9/14, G06F21/60
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINZELKNOTEN-MEHRPARTEI-VERSCHLÜSSELUNG[2020/28]
English:SINGLE NODE MULTI-PARTY ENCRYPTION[2020/28]
French:CHIFFREMENT MULTIPARTITE SUR NOEUD UNIQUE[2020/28]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2020National basic fee paid 
31.03.2020Search fee paid 
31.03.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2020Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.03.2020Examination requested  [2020/28]
02.08.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.12.2021Fee for grant paid
09.12.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.12.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP22151981.2  / EP4002754
Opposition(s)20.10.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
19.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
18.08.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.08.2017
AL19.01.2022
AT19.01.2022
CY19.01.2022
CZ19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
EE19.01.2022
ES19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
IT19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
MC19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RO19.01.2022
RS19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
SI19.01.2022
SK19.01.2022
SM19.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
BE31.08.2022
CH31.08.2022
IE31.08.2022
LI31.08.2022
LU31.08.2022
[2024/24]
Former [2024/21]AL19.01.2022
AT19.01.2022
CY19.01.2022
CZ19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
EE19.01.2022
ES19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
IT19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
MC19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RO19.01.2022
RS19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
SI19.01.2022
SK19.01.2022
SM19.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
BE31.08.2022
CH31.08.2022
IE31.08.2022
LI31.08.2022
LU31.08.2022
Former [2023/42]AL19.01.2022
AT19.01.2022
CZ19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
EE19.01.2022
ES19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
IT19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
MC19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RO19.01.2022
RS19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
SI19.01.2022
SK19.01.2022
SM19.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
BE31.08.2022
CH31.08.2022
IE31.08.2022
LI31.08.2022
LU31.08.2022
Former [2023/35]AL19.01.2022
AT19.01.2022
CZ19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
EE19.01.2022
ES19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
IT19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
MC19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RO19.01.2022
RS19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
SI19.01.2022
SK19.01.2022
SM19.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
CH31.08.2022
IE31.08.2022
LI31.08.2022
LU31.08.2022
Former [2023/33]AL19.01.2022
AT19.01.2022
CZ19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
EE19.01.2022
ES19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
MC19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RO19.01.2022
RS19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
SI19.01.2022
SK19.01.2022
SM19.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
CH31.08.2022
IE31.08.2022
LI31.08.2022
LU31.08.2022
Former [2023/21]AL19.01.2022
AT19.01.2022
CZ19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
EE19.01.2022
ES19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
MC19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RO19.01.2022
RS19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
SI19.01.2022
SK19.01.2022
SM19.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
CH31.08.2022
LI31.08.2022
LU31.08.2022
Former [2023/16]AL19.01.2022
AT19.01.2022
CZ19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
EE19.01.2022
ES19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
MC19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RO19.01.2022
RS19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
SI19.01.2022
SK19.01.2022
SM19.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2023/10]AL19.01.2022
AT19.01.2022
CZ19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
EE19.01.2022
ES19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RO19.01.2022
RS19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
SI19.01.2022
SK19.01.2022
SM19.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2023/01]AL19.01.2022
AT19.01.2022
CZ19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
EE19.01.2022
ES19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RO19.01.2022
RS19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
SK19.01.2022
SM19.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2022/49]AT19.01.2022
CZ19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
EE19.01.2022
ES19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RO19.01.2022
RS19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
SK19.01.2022
SM19.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2022/48]AT19.01.2022
CZ19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
EE19.01.2022
ES19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RO19.01.2022
RS19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
SM19.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2022/47]AT19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
ES19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RO19.01.2022
RS19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
SM19.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2022/46]AT19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
ES19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RS19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2022/42]AT19.01.2022
ES19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RS19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2022/39]AT19.01.2022
ES19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RS19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2022/36]AT19.01.2022
ES19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RS19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2022/35]ES19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
RS19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2022/34]ES19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
NO19.04.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2022/33]LT19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
NO19.04.2022
Former [2022/31]NL19.01.2022
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1587237  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [A]US2013259226  (CIET MATHIEU [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2016135738  (DYADIC SECURITY LTD [IL]) [A] 1-11 * page 8, paragraph l - page 11; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]  - CHOW S ET AL, "WHITE-BOX CRYPTOGRAPHY AND AN AES IMPLEMENTATION", SELECTED AREAS IN CRYPTOGRAPHY : 9TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ; REVISED PAPERS / SAC 2002, ST. JOHN'S, NEWFOUNDLAND, CANADA, AUGUST 15 - 16, 2002; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE ; 2595], SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN (DE), (20020815), vol. 2595, ISBN 978-3-540-00622-0, pages 250 - 270, XP002521155 [A] 1-11 * sections 3 and 4 *
International search[A]WO2017009388  (ABB SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [A] 1-20 * See page 2, lines 7-21; page 7, lines 10-24; and figure 1. *;
 [A]US9577829  (ROTH GREGORY BRANCHEK [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 46; column 4, lines 51-54; column 6, lines 27-39; column 18, lines 32-52; column 19, lines 3-15; and figure 2. *;
 [A]US2017078255  (NEJADIAN ARASH [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0031]-[0052]; and figure 1. *;
 [A]KR101743929B  (DIGICAPS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0013], [0021]-[0034]; and figure 1. *;
 [A]US2017161732  (KURIAN MANU JACOB [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0030]-[0039]; and figure 2. *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.