EP3686303 - STEEL PIPE AND STEEL PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/31] | STEEL TUBE AND STEEL SHEET | ||
[2021/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008071 / JP | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARA Takuya c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 02 /
SHINOHARA Yasuhiro c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 03 /
FUJISHIRO Taishi c/o NIPPON STEEL&SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/31] | Application number, filing date | 17925948.6 | 19.09.2017 | [2020/31] | WO2017JP33722 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019058424 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3686303 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3686303 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C21D8/02, C21D8/10, C21D9/08, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/08, C22C38/12, C22C38/14, C22C38/16, C22C38/18, C22C38/22, C22C38/24, C22C38/26, C22C38/28, C22C38/40, C21D1/19 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
C21D8/105 (EP);
C22C38/58 (KR);
B23K31/027 (KR);
C21D8/0205 (EP,KR);
C21D9/085 (EP);
C22C38/001 (EP);
C22C38/002 (EP);
C22C38/005 (EP);
C22C38/02 (EP);
C22C38/04 (EP);
C22C38/06 (EP);
C22C38/08 (EP);
C22C38/12 (EP);
C22C38/14 (EP);
C22C38/16 (EP);
C22C38/18 (EP);
C22C38/22 (EP);
C22C38/24 (EP);
C22C38/26 (EP);
C22C38/28 (EP);
C22C38/40 (EP,KR);
C22C38/42 (KR);
C21D1/19 (EP);
C21D2211/002 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/31] | C22C38/00, C22C38/58, C21D8/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STAHLROHR UND STAHLPLATTE | [2021/52] | English: | STEEL PIPE AND STEEL PLATE | [2021/52] | French: | TUYAU D' ACIER ET PLAQUE D'ACIER | [2021/52] |
Former [2020/31] | STAHLROHR UND STAHLBLECH | ||
Former [2020/31] | STEEL TUBE AND STEEL SHEET | ||
Former [2020/31] | TUBE EN ACIER ET TÔLE D'ACIER | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2020 | Translation filed | 30.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 13.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 29.12.2021 | CY | 29.12.2021 | CZ | 29.12.2021 | DK | 29.12.2021 | EE | 29.12.2021 | ES | 29.12.2021 | FI | 29.12.2021 | HR | 29.12.2021 | IT | 29.12.2021 | LT | 29.12.2021 | LV | 29.12.2021 | MC | 29.12.2021 | NL | 29.12.2021 | PL | 29.12.2021 | RO | 29.12.2021 | RS | 29.12.2021 | SE | 29.12.2021 | SI | 29.12.2021 | SK | 29.12.2021 | SM | 29.12.2021 | BG | 29.03.2022 | NO | 29.03.2022 | GR | 30.03.2022 | IS | 29.04.2022 | PT | 29.04.2022 | GB | 19.09.2022 | IE | 19.09.2022 | LU | 19.09.2022 | [2024/21] |
Former [2023/47] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
GB | 19.09.2022 | ||
IE | 19.09.2022 | ||
LU | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
IE | 19.09.2022 | ||
LU | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
LU | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
IT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
MC | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SI | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 29.12.2021 | |
CZ | 29.12.2021 | ||
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | CZ | 29.12.2021 | |
DK | 29.12.2021 | ||
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | CZ | 29.12.2021 | |
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
IS | 29.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | CZ | 29.12.2021 | |
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
PL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 29.12.2021 | |
EE | 29.12.2021 | ||
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SK | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 29.12.2021 | |
ES | 29.12.2021 | ||
FI | 29.12.2021 | ||
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RO | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
PT | 29.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
SM | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/31] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
NL | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
NO | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
HR | 29.12.2021 | ||
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
LV | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
SE | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
GR | 30.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 29.12.2021 | |
LT | 29.12.2021 | ||
RS | 29.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 29.12.2021 | |
BG | 29.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 29.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5499733B (JFE STEEL CORP) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A]US2015059912 (SHIMAMURA JUNJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015090370 (SHIMAMURA JUNJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO2012043984 (HYUNDAI STEEL CO [KR], et al) [A] 1-8 * , & US 2013/0224063 A1 & EP 2623625 A2 & KR 10-2012-0033235 A *; | [A]WO2013100106 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * , & EP 2799567 A1 & CN 104024453 A & KR 10-2014-0095103 A *; | [A]WO2015030210 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * , & EP 3042976 A1 & CN 105143487 A & KR 10-2015-0139950 A & RU 2016106920 A *; | [A]CN104419871 (ANGANG STEEL CO LTD) [A] 1-8* , (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2015183273 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP) [A] 1-8 * , (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2008013800 | JP2008156754 | JP2008163455 | JP2008163456 |