Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3536478

EP3536478 - METHOD FOR SELECTING MATERIAL OF INJECTION-MOLDED ARTICLE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING INJECTION-MOLDED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Change - classificationpublished on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
15.11.2019Change - classificationpublished on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Chem, Ltd.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Hyun Sup
LG Chem Research Park
188 Munji-ro
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 34122 / KR
02 / SUN, Soon Ho
LG Chem Research Park
188 Munji-ro
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 34122 / KR
03 / CHOI, Yi Young
LG Chem Research Park
188 Munji-ro
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 34122 / KR
04 / LEE, Ki Soo
LG Chem Research Park
188 Munji-ro
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 34122 / KR
05 / HONG, Bog Ki
LG Chem Research Park
188 Munji-ro
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 34122 / KR
06 / PARK, Sung Hyun
LG Chem Research Park
188 Munji-ro
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 34122 / KR
07 / LEE, Myung Han
LG Chem Research Park
188 Munji-ro
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 34122 / KR
08 / CHUNG, Chang Kwon
LG Chem Research Park
188 Munji-ro
Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 34122 / KR
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date17926781.029.09.2017
[2019/37]
WO2017KR11046
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2019066112
Date:04.04.2019
Language:KO
[2019/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3536478
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR04.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:B29C45/00, B29C45/76, // B29K23/00
[2019/51]
Former International [2019/37]B29C45/76, B29B9/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWAHL DES MATERIALS EINES SPRITZGEGOSSENEN GEGENSTANDES UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SPRITZGEGOSSENEN GEGENSTANDES[2019/37]
English:METHOD FOR SELECTING MATERIAL OF INJECTION-MOLDED ARTICLE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING INJECTION-MOLDED ARTICLE[2019/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR LA SÉLECTION D'UN MATÉRIAU D'ARTICLE MOULÉ PAR INJECTION ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION D'UN ARTICLE MOULÉ PAR INJECTION[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase03.06.2019Translation filed 
15.05.2019National basic fee paid 
15.05.2019Search fee paid 
15.05.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
15.05.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]KR100459304B  (TORAY INDUSTRIES. INC.) [A] 1-15 * See page 5 and claim 17. *;
 [A]KR101746692B  (BOREALIS AG.) [A] 1-15 * See paragraph [0014] and claim 1. *;
 [A]KR20090073567  (HYOSUNG CORP [KR]) [A] 1-15 * See claim 1. *;
 [A]KR20010043690  (THE DOW CHEMICAL. COMPANY) [A] 1-15 * See claim 1. *;
 [A]KR20150038416  (EXXONMOBIL CHEMICAL PATENTS INC.) [A] 1-15 * See claim 1 and figure 1. *
by applicantKR101638240B