EP3675610 - HIGH STRENGTH FINGERPRINT-PROOF GLASS AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND EXTERIOR MEMBER OF HIGH STRENGTH FINGERPRINT-PROOF GLASS AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Joon Suh Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
XU, Ting Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LI, Qingmeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
XU, Yanxiang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/27] | Application number, filing date | 17928744.6 | 21.12.2017 | [2020/27] | WO2017CN117801 | Priority number, date | CN201710950164 | 13.10.2017 Original published format: CN201710950164 | [2020/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019071835 | Date: | 18.04.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3675610 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C03C15/00 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
C03C15/00 (EP,KR,US);
C03B23/023 (US);
C03C19/00 (US);
C03C23/0075 (US);
G02B1/18 (RU,US);
G02B27/0006 (RU);
|
Former IPC [2020/27] | H05K5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Title | German: | HOCHFESTES FINGERABDRUCKRESISTENTES GLAS UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR SOWIE AUSSENTEIL EINES HOCHFESTEN FINGERABDRUCKRESISTENTEN GLASES UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/27] | English: | HIGH STRENGTH FINGERPRINT-PROOF GLASS AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND EXTERIOR MEMBER OF HIGH STRENGTH FINGERPRINT-PROOF GLASS AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR | [2020/27] | French: | VERRE RÉSISTANT AUX EMPREINTES DIGITALES À HAUTE RÉSISTANCE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION, ET ÉLÉMENT EXTÉRIEUR DE VERRE RÉSISTANT AUX EMPREINTES DIGITALES À HAUTE RÉSISTANCE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2020/27] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2020 | Translation filed | 26.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 22.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010033818 (PETCAVICH ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1,10,12 * paragraphs [0045] , [0 50] , [0 52] , [0 60] , [0 61] , [0 78] * * abstract * * figures 3A-3F * [I] 2-9,11,13-15; | [XI]WO2012165107 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,12 * paragraphs [0020] , [0 31] , [0 33] * * abstract * [I] 2-9,13,14; | [XI]WO2017018692 (DON CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0 11] , [0 66] *[I] 2-9,13,14 |