Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473284

EP3473284 - ELASTIC AND SLIDING VALVULAR JOINT , SUITABLE TO WORK IN PRE-FILLED SYRINGES AND SAID SYRINGES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Szapiro, Jaime Luis
St/ Sinclair 3202, piso 6° "a"
Ciudad de Buenos Aires / AR
For all designated states
Bonino, Saul Moreno
St/ ruta 25 km 7 1/2, manzana 31 "b"
Ciub de Campo San Diego
Moreno
Provincia de Buenos Aires / AR
For all designated states
Szapiro, German Andres
St/ Sanchez de Loris 285, piso 4° "a"
Ciudad de Buenos Aires / AR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Fernández-Pacheco, Aurelio Fernández
Lerroux & Fernández-Pacheco
C/Claudio Coello, 124, 4° izquierda
28006 Madrid / ES
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18000270.119.03.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateAR2001P29021719.10.2017         Original published format: AR P010290217
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473284
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/28, A61M5/24, A61M5/31, A61J1/20, A61M3/00, A61M5/315
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELASTISCHES UND GLEITENDES VENTILGELENK, GEEIGNET ZUM ARBEITEN IN VORGEFÜLLTEN SPRITZEN UND DIESE SPRITZEN[2019/17]
English:ELASTIC AND SLIDING VALVULAR JOINT , SUITABLE TO WORK IN PRE-FILLED SYRINGES AND SAID SYRINGES[2019/17]
French:JOINT VALVULAIRE ET COULISSANT, ÉLASTIQUE POUVANT FONCTIONNER DANS DES SERINGUES PRÉ-REMPLIES ET LESDITES SERINGUES[2019/17]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
20.03.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
29.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Documents cited:Search[Y]CN102861369B  (LEONARDO SZAMES, et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0075]; figures 1-16; claims 1-7 *;
 [Y]AR100575  (SZAPIRO JAIME LUIS [AR], et al) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP1213036  (SZAPIRO MELAMED JAIME LUIS [AR], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1-15 *;
 [Y]EP0974373  (SZAPIRO MELAMED JAIME LUIS [AR], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1-16 *;
 [Y]US5643224  (SZAPIRO JAIME LUIS [AR], et al) [Y] 5,6,9 * column 2, line 66 - column 4, line 13; figures 1-8 *
by applicantAR026723
 AR082099