Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473190

EP3473190 - SYSTEM FOR OCCLUSION OF AN ANEURYSM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stsat AG
Chemin de la Clergère 23
1009 Pully / CH
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Plowiecki, Nicolas
19 rue de Pontoise
95160 Montmorency / FR
02 / Ramalson, Alain
54 rue des Gaudines
95660 Champagen-sur-Oise / FR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Flavenot, Bernard
ABRITT
17, rue du Docteur Charcot
91290 La Norville / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18000813.816.10.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateFR2017007111223.10.2017         Original published format: FR 1771112
[2019/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473190
Date:24.04.2019
Language:FR
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/12
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUM VERSCHLIESSEN EINES ANEURISMAS[2019/17]
English:SYSTEM FOR OCCLUSION OF AN ANEURYSM[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME POUR BOUCHER UN ANÉVRISME[2019/17]
Examination procedure21.05.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/28]
Documents cited:Search[A]US2003171739  (MURPHY RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0072] * * figures 1-5,7,18 *;
 [A]US2007073334  (RAMZIPOOR KAMAL [US]) [A] 1,5 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0061] * * figures 4,5 *;
 [A]EP1006890  (BOSTON SCIENT CORP [US]) [A] 1,3 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * figures 1-3,11 *;
 [A]EP1985240  (CORDIS DEV CORP [US]) [A] 1,4 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]DE102013106031  (ACANDIS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004044391  (PORTER STEPHEN [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *