Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3395383

EP3395383 - CELL PREPARATIONS FOR EXTEMPORANEOUS USE, USEFUL FOR HEALING AND REJUVENATION IN VIVO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.01.2020
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.05.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Regen Lab SA
En Budron B2
1052 Le Mont-sur-Lausanne / CH
[2018/44]
Inventor(s)01 / TURZI Antoine
5 B rue De L'Englise
1146 Mollens / CH
 [2018/44]
Representative(s)Sach, Greg Robert
Sach & Associates
Siedlungsstrasse 4a
85253 Erdweg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/44](deleted)
...
Application number, filing date18020250.921.08.2007
[2018/44]
Priority number, dateWO2006EP6549321.08.2006         Original published format: PCT/EP2006/065493
[2018/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3395383
Date:31.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/36, B01L3/14, G01N33/49, A61K38/36, A61L24/00, A61L24/10, A61L26/00, A61K35/14, A61K35/16, A61K35/19
[2018/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/24]
Former [2018/44]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:ZUR WUNDHEILUNG UND IN-VIVO-VERJÜNGUNG NÜTZLICHE ZELLPRÄPARATE ZUR IMPROVISIERTEN VERWENDUNG[2018/44]
English:CELL PREPARATIONS FOR EXTEMPORANEOUS USE, USEFUL FOR HEALING AND REJUVENATION IN VIVO[2018/44]
French:PRÉPARATIONS CELLULAIRES POUR UTILISATION EXTEMPORANÉE, UTILES POUR LA CICATRISATION ET LE RAJEUNISSEMENT IN VIVO[2018/44]
Examination procedure30.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/24]
30.04.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.08.2019Observations by third parties
16.01.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07802770.3  / EP2073862
EP16172748.2  / EP3111974
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
26.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
26.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
26.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
26.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
26.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
26.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
29.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[I]US5667963  (SMITH WARD C [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * column 7, line 54 - column 8, line 52 * * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 22; figure 1 * * column 10 *;
 [I]US2004151709  (GORROCHATEGUI BARRUETA ALBERTO [ES], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0023] , [0 28] , [0 29] , [0 65] , [0 92] - [0097] *;
 [I]US2002187130  (KINDNESS GEORGE [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0049] - [0059] *
by applicantUS5891617
 US6472162
 EP1543846
    - "Structure and signals", Gibbins and Mahaut-Smith, Platelets and Megacaryocytes, Humana Press, (20040000), vol. 1 & 2
    - MARX et al., J. Oral Maxillofac. Surg., (20040000), vol. 62, pages 489 - 496
    - ROUKIS et al., Adv. Ther., (20060000), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 218 - 37
    - WEIBRICH et al., Bone, (20040000), vol. 34, no. 4, pages 665 - 71
    - ARNAUD et al., Cryobiology, (19990000), vol. 38, pages 192 - 199
    - TABLIN et al., Cryobiology, (20010000), vol. 43, no. 2, pages 114 - 23
    - OH et al., Cornea, vol. 26, pages 840 - 846
    - REINWALD; GREEN, Cell, (19750000), vol. 6, no. 3, pages 331 - 43
    - GARG et al., Dental Implantology Update, (20000000), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 41 - 44
    - MOLNAR et al., Tissue & Cell, (19960000), vol. 28, pages 547 - 556
    - MELLER et al., Br. J. Opht., (20020000), vol. 86, pages 463 - 471
    - GROVE et al., J. Am. Acad. Dermatol., (19890000), vol. 21, pages 631 - 7
    - TRONNIER et al., Akt. Dermatol., (19970000), vol. 23, pages 290 - 295
    - FLUHR et al., Akt. Dermatol., (19950000), vol. 21, pages 151 - 156
    - PAGE et al., Diba. Vas. Dis. Res., (20070000), pages 7 - 12