Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470331

EP3470331 - MOUNT FOR SUPPORTING A COMPONENT AND ATTENUATING NOISE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.01.2020
Database last updated on 25.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.2020(Expected) grantpublished on 04.03.2020 [2020/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bell Helicopter Textron Inc.
P.O. Box 482
Fort Worth, TX 76101 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BENNETT, Jon Damon
5115 Lake Washington Road
Melbourne, FL 32934 / US
02 / EDLER, Joshua Allan
701 North Bishop Ave, Apt. A
Dallas, TX 75208 / US
03 / HENDRICKS, Matthew Wade
5815 Midnight Lane
Grand Prairie, TX 75052 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18151047.010.01.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS20171572898910.10.2017         Original published format: US201715728989
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470331
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3470331
Date:04.03.2020
Language:EN
[2020/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.06.2018
ClassificationInternational:B64C27/00, B64D27/26
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:HALTERUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG EINER KOMPONENTE UND GERÄUSCHDÄMPFUNG[2019/16]
English:MOUNT FOR SUPPORTING A COMPONENT AND ATTENUATING NOISE[2019/16]
French:MONTAGE DE SUPPORT DE COMPOSANT ET D'ATTÉNUATION DU BRUIT[2019/16]
Examination procedure10.01.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
13.06.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.10.2019Fee for grant paid
29.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2017053634  (AMAZON TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-5,7,8,10,11,13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 12] - [0017] - [0 27] - [0035] - [0 38] , [0 40] - [0049]; figures 1, 2, 3, 5, 6 * [I] 6,9,12;
 [XI]US4111386  (KENIGSBERG IRWIN JEFFREY, et al) [X] 1-5,7,9-11,13 * column 1, lines 8-16; figures 1, 4-7 * * column 1, lines 30-40 * * column 2, lines 3-19 * * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 3 * * column 5, lines 16-37 * [I] 6,8,12;
 [A]EP2179922  (AGUSTA SPA [IT]) [A] 6 * Items 17 with visible dampers;; figure 2 *