Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3401400

EP3401400 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR RNA-DIRECTED TARGET DNA MODIFICATION AND FOR RNA-DIRECTED MODULATION OF TRANSCRIPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.03.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.02.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.02.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.02.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.11.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  12.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor
Oakland, CA 94607 / US
For all designated states
University of Vienna
Universitätsring 1
1010 Vienna / AT
For all designated states
Charpentier, Emmanuelle
Department Of Regulation in Infection Biology
Max Planck Institute for Infection Biology
Charitéplatz 1
10117 Berlin / DE
[2018/46]
Inventor(s)01 / CHARPENTIER, Emmanuelle
Department Of Regulation in Infection Biology
Max Planck Institute for Infection Biology
Charitéplatz 1
10117 Berlin / DE
02 / JINEK, Martin
1846 Spruce Street
Berkeley, CA 94709 / US
03 / DOUDNA CATE, James Harrison
164 Vicente Road
Berkeley, CA 94705 / US
04 / LIM, Wendell
149 Collins Street
San Francisco, CA 94118 / US
05 / QI, Lei
730 Kinkead Way, 302
Albany, CA 94706 / US
06 / CHYLINSKI, Krzysztof
Simmeringer Hauptstrasse 45/8
1110 Vienna / AT
07 / DOUDNA, Jennifer A.
164 Vicente Road
Berkeley, CA 94705 / US
 [2018/46]
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/14]Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
Former [2018/46]Green, Katherine , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
Application number, filing date18152360.615.03.2013
[2018/46]
Priority number, dateUS201261652086P25.05.2012         Original published format: US 201261652086 P
US201261716256P19.10.2012         Original published format: US 201261716256 P
US201361757640P28.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361757640 P
US201361765576P15.02.2013         Original published format: US 201361765576 P
[2018/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3401400
Date:14.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3401400
Date:03.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.2018
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/11, C12N15/63, C07K19/00, C12N15/10, C12N15/90, A61K38/46, A61K48/00
[2018/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/52]
Former [2018/46]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBA19.11.2018
ME19.11.2018
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR RNA-GESTEUERTEN ZIEL-DNA-MODIFIKATION UND ZUR RNA-GESTEUERTEN TRANSKRIPTIONSMODULATION[2018/46]
English:METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR RNA-DIRECTED TARGET DNA MODIFICATION AND FOR RNA-DIRECTED MODULATION OF TRANSCRIPTION[2018/46]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS PERMETTANT LA MODIFICATION DE L'ADN CIBLE DIRIGÉE PAR L'ARN ET LA MODULATION DE LA TRANSCRIPTION DIRIGÉE PAR L'ARN[2018/46]
Examination procedure19.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.11.2018Examination requested  [2018/52]
19.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.01.2019Observations by third parties
05.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.02.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
11.02.2019Fee for grant paid
11.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.02.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
20.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13793997.1  / EP2800811
EP17163434.8  / EP3241902
Divisional application(s)EP19157590.1
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.04.2019   
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte ParG mbB
Fünf Höfe
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Pohlman, Sandra M.
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstrasse 16
80333 München / DE
 [2019/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
08.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2011072246  (UNIV MINNESOTA [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2010021692  (SANGAMO BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO2014089290  (SIGMA ALDRICH CO LLC [US], et al) [E] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO2014065596  (TOOLGEN INC [KR]) [E] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO2014093661  (BROAD INST INC [US], et al) [E] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO2014093712  (BROAD INST INC [US], et al) [E] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO2014099744  (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [E] 1-23 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PAPWORTH M ET AL, "Designer zinc-finger proteins and their applications", GENE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 366, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.GENE.2005.09.011, ISSN 0378-1119, (20060117), pages 27 - 38, (20060117), XP024934269 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.gene.2005.09.011
 [A]  - ELITZA DELTCHEVA ET AL, "CRISPR RNA maturation by trans-encoded small RNA and host factor RNase III", NATURE, (20110331), vol. 471, no. 7340, doi:10.1038/nature09886, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 602 - 607, XP055308803 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09886
 [A]  - MAKAROVA KIRA S ET AL, "Evolution and classification of the CRISPR-Cas systems", NATURE REVIEWS. MICROBIO, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20110509), vol. 9, no. 6, doi:10.1038/NRMICRO2577, ISSN 1740-1526, pages 467 - 477, XP009155547 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrmicro2577
 [A]  - BLAKE WIEDENHEFT ET AL, "RNA-guided genetic silencing systems in bacteria and archaea", NATURE, (20120215), vol. 482, no. 7385, doi:10.1038/nature10886, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 331 - 338, XP055116249 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature10886
 [XPI]  - M. JINEK ET AL, "A Programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity", SCIENCE, (20120817), vol. 337, no. 6096, doi:10.1126/science.1225829, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 816 - 821, XP055299674 [XP] 11-14,18,19,22 * the whole document * [I] 1-23

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
 [P]  - M. JINEK ET AL, "A Programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity (Supplementary Material)", SCIENCE, US, (20120628), vol. 337, no. 6096, doi:10.1126/science.1225829, ISSN 0036-8075, page 821, XP055067747 [P] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829
 [XPI]  - L. CONG ET AL, "Multiplex Genome Engineering Using CRISPR/Cas Systems", SCIENCE, (20130215), vol. 339, no. 6121, doi:10.1126/science.1231143, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 819 - 823, XP055067741 [XP] 1,3-7,9-14,16,18,19,22 * the whole document * [I] 1-23

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143
 [P]  - L. CONG ET AL, "Supplementary Material to : Multiplex Genome Engineering Using CRISPR/Cas Systems", SCIENCE, (20130103), vol. 339, no. 6121, doi:10.1126/science.1231143, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 819 - 823, XP055067744 [P] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143
 [XPI]  - P. MALI ET AL, "RNA-Guided Human Genome Engineering via Cas9", SCIENCE, (20130103), vol. 339, no. 6121, doi:10.1126/science.1232033, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 823 - 826, XP055111247 [XP] 1,3-7,9-14,16,18,19,22 * the whole document * [I] 1-23

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033
 [P]  - P. Mali ET AL, "Supplementary information for RNA-Guided Human Genome Engineering via Cas9 (XP 055337932)", Science, (20130103), vol. 339, no. 6121, doi:10.1126/science.1232033, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 823 - 826, XP055403737 [P] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033
 [XPI]  - MARTIN JINEK ET AL, "RNA-programmed genome editing in human cells", E-LIFE, SAM LTD, GB, vol. 2, doi:10.7554/ELIFE.00471, ISSN 2050-084X, (20130129), pages e00471 - 1, (20130628), XP002699851 [XP] 1,3-7,9-14,16,18,19,22 * the whole document * [I] 1-23

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471
 [P]  - Martin Jinek ET AL, "RNA-programmed genome editing in human cells (Figures and figure supplements)", eLife, (20130129), vol. 2, doi:10.7554/eLife.00471, XP055167481 [P] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471
by applicantUS7169874
 WO0118048
 US7029913
 US5843780
 US6200806
 WO9920741
 WO0151616
 WO03020920
 US7153684
 US2009047263
 US2009068742
 US2009191159
 US2009227032
 US2009246875
 US2009304646
 US5489677
 US5602240
 US5034506
 US5539082
 US5714331
 US5719262
 WO9839352
 WO9914226
 US3687808
 US7078387
 WO9412649
 WO9303769
 WO9319191
 WO9428938
 WO9511984
 WO9500655
 WO9309239
 US2003220334
 US2003083256
 US2003032593
 US2003022831
 US5222982
 US5385582
 US2007254842
 US2008081064
 US2009196903
 US5451513
 US5545817
 US5545818
 US5576198
 WO9516783
    - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410
    - ZHANG; MADDEN, Genome Res., (19970000), vol. 7, pages 649 - 656
    - SMITH; WATERMAN, Adv. Appl. Math., (19810000), vol. 2, pages 482 - 489
    - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Bioi., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 10
    - MIYAGISHI et al., Nature Biotechnology, (20020000), vol. 20, pages 497 - 500
    - XIA et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20030901), vol. 31, no. 17
    - CHEN et al., Cell, (19870000), vol. 51, pages 7 - 19
    - LLEWELLYN et al., Nat. Med., (20100000), vol. 16, no. 10, pages 1161 - 1166
    - OH et al., Gene Ther, (20090000), vol. 16, page 437
    - SASAOKA et al., Mol. Brain Res., (19920000), vol. 16, page 274
    - BOUNDY et al., J. Neurosci., (19980000), vol. 18, page 9989
    - KANEDA et al., Neuron, (19910000), vol. 6, pages 583 - 594
    - RADOVICK et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19910000), vol. 88, pages 3402 - 3406
    - OBERDICK et al., Science, (19900000), vol. 248, pages 223 - 226
    - BARTGE et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, pages 3648 - 3652
    - COMB et al., EMBO J., (19880000), vol. 17, pages 3793 - 3805
    - MAYFORD et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19960000), vol. 93, page 13250
    - CASANOVA et al., Genesis, (20010000), vol. 31, page 37
    - LIU et al., Gene Therapy, (20040000), vol. 11, pages 52 - 60
    - TOZZO et al., Endocrinol, (19970000), vol. 138, page 1604
    - ROSS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19900000), vol. 87, page 9590
    - PAVJANI et al., Nat. Med., (20050000), vol. 11, page 797
    - KNIGHT et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20030000), vol. 100, page 14725
    - KURIKI et al., Biol. Pharm. Bull., (20020000), vol. 25, page 1476
    - SATO et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20020000), vol. 277, page 15703
    - TABOR et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19990000), vol. 274, page 20603
    - MASON et al., Endocrinol, (19980000), vol. 139, page 1013
    - CHEN et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Comm., (19990000), vol. 262, page 187
    - KITA et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Comm., (20050000), vol. 331, page 484
    - CHAKRABARTI, Endocrinol, (20100000), vol. 151, page 2408
    - PLATT et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19890000), vol. 86, page 7490
    - SEO et al., Molec. Endocrinol., (20030000), vol. 17, page 1522
    - FRANZ et al., Cardiovasc. Res., (19970000), vol. 35, pages 560 - 566
    - ROBBINS et al., Ann. N.Y. Acad. Sci., (19950000), vol. 752, pages 492 - 505
    - LINN et al., Circ. Res., (19950000), vol. 76, pages 584 - 591
    - PARMACEK et al., Mol. Cell. Biol., (19940000), vol. 14, pages 1870 - 1885
    - HUNTER et al., Hypertension, (19930000), vol. 22, pages 608 - 617
    - SARTORELLI et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 4047 - 4051
    - AKYIIREK et al., Mol. Med., (20000000), vol. 6, page 983
    - KIM et al., Mol. Cell. Biol., (19970000), vol. 17, pages 2266 - 2278
    - LI et al., J. Cell Biol., (19960000), vol. 132, pages 849 - 859
    - MOESSLER et al., Development, (19960000), vol. 122, pages 2415 - 2425
    - YOUNG et al., Ophthalmol. Vis. Sci., (20030000), vol. 44, page 4076
    - NICOUD et al., J. Gene Med., (20070000), vol. 9, page 1015
    - YOKOYAMA et al., Exp Eye Res., (19920000), vol. 55, page 225
    - PANYAM, Adv Drug Deliv Rev., (20120913), vol. S0169-40, no. 12, pages 00283 - 9
    - MORRISON et al., Cell, (19970000), vol. 88, pages 287 - 298
    - THOMSON, Science, (19981106), vol. 282, no. 5391, pages 1145 - 7
    - TAKAHASHI, Cell, (20071130), vol. 131, no. 5, pages 861 - 72
    - TAKAHASHI, Nat Protoc., (20070000), vol. 2, no. 12, pages 3081 - 9
    - YU, Science, (20071221), vol. 318, no. 5858, pages 1917 - 20
    - THOMSON et al., Science, (19980000), vol. 282, page 1145
    - THOMSON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci USA, (19950000), vol. 92, page 7844
    - THOMSON et al., Biol. Reprod., (19960000), vol. 55, page 254
    - SHAMBLOTT et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19980000), vol. 95, page 13726
    - MATSUI, Y. et al., Cell, (19920000), vol. 70, page 841
    - SHAMBLOTT, M. et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20010000), vol. 98, page 113
    - SHAMBLOTT, M. et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19980000), vol. 95, page 13726
    - KOSHIMIZU, U. et al., Development, (19960000), vol. 122, page 1235
    - NAKAMURA et al., Genes Cells, (20120500), vol. 17, no. 5, pages 344 - 64
    - VAVALLE et al., Future Cardiol., (20120500), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 371 - 82
    - CITARTAN et al., Biosens Bioelectron, (20120415), vol. 34, no. 1, pages 1 - 11
    - LIBERMAN et al., Wiley Interdiscip Rev RNA, (20120500), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 369 - 84
    - DWAINE A. BRAASCH; DAVID R. COREY, Biochemistry, (20020000), vol. 41, no. 14, pages 4503 - 4510
    - WANG et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20000000), vol. 122, pages 8595 - 8602
    - SINGH et al., Chem. Commun., (19980000), vol. 4, pages 455 - 456
    - WAHLESTEDT et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (20000000), vol. 97, pages 5633 - 5638
    - KOSHKIN et al., Tetrahedron, (19980000), vol. 54, pages 3607 - 3630
    - MARTIN et al., Helv. Chim. Acta, (19950000), vol. 78, pages 486 - 504
    - Kroschwitz, J. I., The Concise Encyclopedia Of Polymer Science And Engineering, John Wiley & Sons, (19900000), pages 858 - 859
    - ENGLISCH et al., Angewandte Chemie, International Edition, (19910000), vol. 30, page 613
    - SANGHVI, Y. S., "Chapter 15", SANGHVI, Y. S., Crooke, S. T. and Lebleu, B., Antisense Research and Applications, CRC Press, (19930000), pages 289 - 302
    - Sanghvi et al., Antisense Research and Applications, CRC Press, (19930000), pages 276 - 278
    - LETSINGER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19890000), vol. 86, pages 6553 - 6556
    - MANOHARAN et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Let., (19940000), vol. 4, pages 1053 - 1060
    - MANOHARAN et al., Ann. N.Y. Acad. Sci., (19920000), vol. 660, pages 306 - 309
    - MANOHARAN et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Let., (19930000), vol. 3, pages 2765 - 2770
    - OBERHAUSER et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19920000), vol. 20, pages 533 - 538
    - SAISON-BEHMOARAS et al., EMBO J., (19910000), vol. 10, pages 1111 - 1118
    - KABANOV et al., FEBS Lett., (19900000), vol. 259, pages 327 - 330
    - SVINARCHUK et al., Biochimie, (19930000), vol. 75, pages 49 - 54
    - MANOHARAN et al., Tetrahedron Lett., (19950000), vol. 36, pages 3651 - 3654
    - SHEA et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19900000), vol. 18, pages 3777 - 3783
    - MANOHARAN et al., Nucleosides & Nucleotides, (19950000), vol. 14, pages 969 - 973
    - MISHRA et al., Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (19950000), vol. 1264, pages 229 - 237
    - CROOKE et al., J. Pharmacol. Exp. Ther., (19960000), vol. 277, pages 923 - 937
    - ZENDER et al., Cancer Gene Ther., (20020000), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 489 - 96
    - NOGUCHI et al., Diabetes, (20030000), vol. 52, no. 7, pages 1732 - 1737
    - TREHIN et al., Pharm. Research, (20040000), vol. 21, pages 1248 - 1256
    - WENDER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20000000), vol. 97, pages 13003 - 13008
    - AGUILERA et al., Integr Biol (Camb, (20090600), vol. 1, no. 5-6, pages 371 - 381
    - LI et al., Invest Opthalmol Vis Sci, (19940000), vol. 35, pages 2543 - 2549
    - BORRAS et al., Gene Ther, (19990000), vol. 6, page 515 524
    - LI; DAVIDSON, PNAS, (19950000), vol. 92, page 7700 7704
    - SAKAMOTO et al., H Gene Ther, (19990000), vol. 5, page 1088 1097
    - ALI et al., Hum Gene Ther, (19980000), vol. 9, page 81 86
    - FLANNERY et al., PNAS, (19970000), vol. 94, page 6916 6921
    - BENNETT et al., Invest Opthalmol Vis Sci, (19970000), vol. 38, page 2857 2863
    - JOMARY et al., Gene Ther, (19970000), vol. 4, page 683 690
    - ROLLING et al., Hum Gene Ther, (19990000), vol. 10, page 641 648
    - ALI et al., Hum Mol Genet, (19960000), vol. 5, page 591 594
    - SAMULSKI et al., J. Vir., (19890000), vol. 63, pages 3822 - 3828
    - MENDELSON et al., Virol., (19880000), vol. 166, pages 154 - 165
    - FLOTTE et al., PNAS, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 10613 - 10617
    - MIYOSHI et al., PNAS, (19970000), vol. 94, page 10319 23
    - TAKAHASHI et al., J Virol, (19990000), vol. 73, page 7812 7816
    - BITTER et al., Methods in Enzymology, (19870000), vol. 153, pages 516 - 544
    - PANYAM, Adv Drug Deliv Rev, (20120913), vol. S0169-40, no. 12, pages 00283 - 9
    - KAWAI et al., "Transformation of Saccharomyces cerevisiae and other fungi: methods and possible underlying mechanism", Bioeng Bugs., (20101100), vol. 1, no. 6, pages 395 - 403
    - TANKA et al., Nature, (20040318), vol. 428, no. 6980, pages 323 - 8
    - ANGEL; YANIK, PLoS ONE, (20100000), vol. 5, no. 7, page el 1756
    - BEUMER et al., "Efficient gene targeting in Drosophila by direct embryo injection with zinc-finger nucleases", PNAS, (20080000), vol. 105, no. 50, pages 19821 - 19826
    - FUTAKI et al., Curr Protein Pept Sci., (20030400), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 87 - 9,446
    - WENDER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A, (20001121), vol. 97, no. 24, pages 13003 - 8
    - CHANG et al., Proc. Natl. Acad Sci USA, (19870000), vol. 84, pages 4959 - 4963
    - NEHLS et al., Science, (19960000), vol. 272, pages 886 - 889
    - LANGER, Science, (19900000), vol. 249, pages 1527 - 1533
    - GAMA et al., Brain Struct Funct, (20100300), vol. 214, no. 2-3, pages 91 - 109
    - HUSAINI et al., GM Crops, (20110601), vol. 2, no. 3, pages 150 - 62
    - KLEIN et al., Nature, (19870000), vol. 327, pages 70 - 73
    - HERRERA-ESTRELLA et al., Nature, (19830000), vol. 303, page 209
    - BEVAN, Nucl Acid Res, (19840000), vol. 12, pages 8711 - 8721
    - KLEE, Bio/Technolo, (19850000), vol. 3, pages 637 - 642
    - CHRISTOU, Bio/Technology, (19910000), vol. 9, pages 957 - 4462
    - GORDON-KAMM, Plant Cell, (19900000), vol. 2, pages 603 - 618
    - WEEKS et al., Plant Physiol, (19930000), vol. 102, pages 1077 - 1084
    - VASIL, Bio/Technolo, (19930000), vol. 10, pages 667 - 674
    - WAN; LEMEAUX, Plant Physiol, (19940000), vol. 104, pages 37 - 48
    - ISHIDA et al., Nature Biotech, (19960000), vol. 14, pages 745 - 750
    - DANIELI et al., Nat. Biotechnol, (19980000), vol. 16, pages 345 - 348
    - STAUB et al., Nat. Biotechnol, (20000000), vol. 18, pages 333 - 338
    - O'NEILL et al., Plant J., (19930000), vol. 3, pages 729 - 738
    - KNOBLAUCH et al., Nat. Biotechnol, vol. 17, pages 906 - 909
    - BOYNTON et al., Methods in Enzymology, (19930000), vol. 217, pages 510 - 536
    - SVAB et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 913 - 917
    - MCBRIDE et al., Proc. Nati. Acad. Sci. USA, (19940000), vol. 91, pages 7301 - 7305
    - CITARTAN et al., Biosens Bioelectron., (20120415), vol. 34, no. 1, pages 1 - 11
    - DOHMEN et al., Science, (19940000), vol. 263, no. 5151, pages 1273 - 1276
    - SCHOEBER et al., Am J Physiol Renal Physiol., (20090100), vol. 296, no. 1, pages F204 - 11
    - CHU et al., Bioorg Med Chem Lett., (20081115), vol. 18, no. 22, pages 5941 - 4
    - YANG et al., Mol Cell, (20121130), vol. 48, no. 4, pages 487 - 8
    - BARBOUR et al., Biosci Rep, (20130118), vol. 33, no. 1
    - LI et al., Invest Opthalmol Vis Sci, (19940000), vol. 35, page 2543 2549
    - LI; DAVIDSON, PNAS, (19950000), vol. 92, pages 7700 - 7704
    - JOMARY et al., Gene Ther, (19970000), vol. 4, pages 683 - 690
    - ALI et al., Hum Mol Genet, (19960000), vol. 5, pages 591 - 594
    - YOKOYAMA et al., Exp Eye Res, (19920000), vol. 55, page 225
    - B. WIEDENHEFT; S. H. STERNBERG; J. A. DOUDNA, Nature, (20120000), vol. 482, page 331
    - D. BHAYA; M. DAVISON; R. BARRANGOU, Annu. Rev. Genet., (20110000), vol. 45, page 273
    - M. P. TERNS; R. M. TERNS, Curr. Opin. Microbiol., (20110000), vol. 14, page 321
    - E. DELTCHEVA et al., Nature, (20110000), vol. 471, page 602
    - J. CARTE; R. WANG; H. LI; R. M. TERNS; M. P. TERNS, Genes Dev, (20080000), vol. 22, page 3489
    - R. E. HAURWITZ; M. JINEK; B. WIEDENHEFT; K. ZHOU; J. A. DOUDNA, Science, (20100000), vol. 329, page 1355
    - R. WANG; G. PREAMPLUME; M. P. TERNS; R. M. TERNS; H. LI, Structure, (20110000), vol. 19, page 257
    - E. M. GESNER; M. J. SCHELLENBERG; E. L. GARSIDE; M. M. GEORGE; A. M. MACMILLAN, Nat. Struct. Mol. Biol., (20110000), vol. 18, page 688
    - A. HATOUM-ASLAN; I. MANIV; L. A. MARRAFFINI, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (20110000), vol. 108, page 21218
    - S. J. J. BROUNS et al., Science, (20080000), vol. 321, page 960
    - D. G. SASHITAL; M. JINEK; J. A. DOUDNA, Nat. Struct. Mol. Biol., (20110000), vol. 18, page 680
    - N. G. LINTNER et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20110000), vol. 286, page 21643
    - E. SEMENOVA et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (20110000), vol. 108, page 10098
    - B. WIEDENHEFT et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (20110000), vol. 108, page 10092
    - B. WIEDENHEFT et al., Nature, (20110000), vol. 477, page 486
    - C. R. HALE et al., Cell, (20090000), vol. 139, page 945
    - J. A. L. HOWARD; S. DELMAS; I. IVANCIC-BACE; E. L. BOLT, Biochem. J., (20110000), vol. 439, page 85
    - E. R. WESTRA et al., Mol. Cell, (20120000), vol. 46, page 595
    - C. R. HALE et al., Mol. Cell, (20120000), vol. 45, page 292
    - J. ZHANG et al., Mol. Cell, (20120000), vol. 45, page 303
    - K. S. MAKAROVA et al., Nat. Rev. Microbiol., (20110000), vol. 9, page 467
    - K. S. MAKAROVA; N. V. GRISHIN; S. A. SHABALINA; Y. I. WOLF; E. V. KOONIN, Biol. Direct, (20060000), vol. 1, page 7
    - K. S. MAKAROVA; L. ARAVIND; Y. I. WOLF; E. V. KOONIN, Biol. Direct, (20110000), vol. 6, page 38
    - S. GOTTESMAN, Nature, (20110000), vol. 471, page 588
    - R. BARRANGOU et al., Science, (20070000), vol. 315, page 1709
    - J. E. GARNEAU et al., Nature, (20100000), vol. 468, page 67
    - R. SAPRANAUSKAS et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20110000), vol. 39, page 9275
    - G. K. TAYLOR; D. F. HEITER; S. PIETROKOVSKI; B. L. STODDARD, Nucleic Acids Res., (20110000), vol. 39, page 9705
    - H. DEVEAU et al., J. Bacteriol., (20080000), vol. 190, page 1390
    - B. P. LEWIS; C. B. BURGE; D. P. BARTEL, Cell, (20050000), vol. 120, page 15
    - G. HUTVAGNER; M. J. SIMARD, Nat. Rev. Mol. Cell Biol., (20080000), vol. 9, page 22
    - F. J. M. MOJICA; C. DIEZ-VILLASENOR; J. GARCIA-MARTINEZ; C. ALMENDROS, Microbiology, (20090000), vol. 155, page 733
    - L. A. MARRAFFINI; E. J. SONTHEIMER, Nature, (20100000), vol. 463, page 568
    - D. G. SASHITAL; B. WIEDENHEFT; J. A. DOUDNA, Mol. Cell, (20120000), vol. 46, page 606
    - M. CHRISTIAN et al., Genetics, (20100000), vol. 186, page 757
    - J. C. MILLER et al., Nat. Biotechnol., (20110000), vol. 29, page 143
    - F. D. URNOV; E. J. REBAR; M. C. HOLMES; H. S. ZHANG; P. D. GREGORY, Nat. Rev. Genet., (20100000), vol. 11, page 636
    - D. CARROLL, Gene Ther, (20080000), vol. 15, page 1463
    - M. G. CAPARON; J. R. SCOTT, "Genetic manipulation of pathogenic streptococci", Methods Enzymol., (19910000), vol. 204, page 556
    - C. FR0KJSER-JENSEN et al., "Single-copy insertion of transgenes in Caenorhabditis elegans", Nat. Genet., (20080000), vol. 40, page 1375
    - R. B. DENMAN, "Using RNAFOLD to predict the activity of small catalytic RNAs", Biotechniques, (19930000), vol. 15, page 1090
    - I. L. HOFACKER; P. F. STADLER, "Memory efficient folding algorithms for circular RNA secondary structures", Bioinformatics, (20060000), vol. 22, page 1172
    - K. DARTY; A. DENISE; Y. PONTY, "VARNA: Interactive drawing and editing of the RNA secondary structure", Bioinformatics, (20090000), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1093/bioinformatics/btp250, page 1974, XP055198531

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bioinformatics/btp250
    - GRISSA I et al., BMC Bioinformatics, (20070000), vol. 8, page 172
    - GenBank, Database accession no. NC_002163
    - GenBank, Database accession no. NC_008601
    - GenBank, Database accession no. NC_003116
    - GenBank, Database accession no. NC_003212
    - GenBank, Database accession no. NC_004350