Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3335547 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3335547



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 198
20.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.12.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
20.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
20.12.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
20.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
25.06.2018 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
20.06.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
24.05.2018 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
12.04.2018 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.04.2018 European search opinion Search / examination 3
12.04.2018 European search report Search / examination 2
12.04.2018 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
15.02.2018 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 4
31.01.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
31.01.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
31.01.2018 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 3
31.01.2018 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 3
31.01.2018 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 3
31.01.2018 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 3
31.01.2018 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 3
31.01.2018 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 3
31.01.2018 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 3
31.01.2018 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 3
31.01.2018 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 3
31.01.2018 Certificate of deposit of biological material Search / examination 3
31.01.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
31.01.2018 Description Search / examination 25
31.01.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
31.01.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
31.01.2018 Drawings Search / examination 2
31.01.2018 Priority search results Search / examination 4
31.01.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 11
27.10.2015 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 4
08.10.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 45
08.10.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 41
09.07.2014 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 3