Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3392876

EP3392876 - USING CONTEXT INFORMATION TO FACILITATE PROCESSING OF COMMANDS IN A VIRTUAL ASSISTANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.05.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.05.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Cupertino CA 95014 / US
[2018/43]
Inventor(s)01 / GRUBER, Thomas
147 Lakeview Way
Cupertino, CA California 94062 / US
02 / KEEN, Dan
420 S. Frances Street
Sunnyvale, CA California 95086 / US
03 / BRIGHAM, Christopher
130 E. San Fernando St., PH3
San Jose, CA California 95112 / US
04 / NOVICK, Gregory
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA California 95014 / US
05 / PHIPPS, Benjamin
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA California 95014 / US
 [2018/43]
Representative(s)Simmons & Simmons
City Point
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/43]Cordina, Kevin John
Simmons & Simmons LLP
CityPoint
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
Application number, filing date18154657.328.09.2012
[2018/43]
Priority number, dateUS20111325085430.09.2011         Original published format: US201113250854
[2018/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3392876
Date:24.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2018
ClassificationInternational:G10L15/18, G10L15/183, // G10L15/22
[2018/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/23]
Former [2018/43]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON KONTEXTINFORMATIONEN ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG DER VERARBEITUNG VON BEFEHLEN BEI EINEM VIRTUELLEN ASSISTENTEN[2018/43]
English:USING CONTEXT INFORMATION TO FACILITATE PROCESSING OF COMMANDS IN A VIRTUAL ASSISTANT[2018/43]
French:UTILISATION DES INFORMATIONS DE CONTEXTE POUR FACILITER LE TRAITEMENT DE COMMANDES DANS UN ASSISTANT VIRTUEL[2018/43]
Examination procedure24.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/23]
24.04.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
27.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.11.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12186663.6  / EP2575128
EP16195814.5  / EP3200185
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
01.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
01.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]US2011183650  (MCKEE MATTHEW [US]) [A] 1-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0052] - [0054] *;
 [A]  - Daniel L Ashbrook, "Enabling Mobile Microinteractions", Atlanta, USA, ISBN 978-1-124-07697-3, (20100531), pages 1 - 186, URL: http://danielashbrook.com/wp-content/uploads/2012/06/2009-Ashbrook-Thesis.pdf, (20170518), XP055374164 [A] 1-10,12-15 * section 3.2.1 on pages 31 and 32 *
 [A]  - Samsung, "SGH-a885 Series - P O R T A B L E Q u a d - B A N D M O B I L E P H O N E - User Manual", Samsung's User Manuals, (20090101), pages 1 - 144, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20100106113758/http://www.comparecellular.com/images/phones/userguide1896.pdf, (20120404), XP055023916 [A] 1-10,12-15 * item 10 on page 13 *
by applicantUS20060518292
 US20090186414
 US20090479477