Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3335548

EP3335548 - TEAT CUP AND A MILKING STALL INCLUDING SUCH A TEAT CUP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  18.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 06.02.2019  [2019/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEA Farm Technologies GmbH
Siemensstrasse 25-27
59199 Bönen / DE
[2018/25]
Inventor(s)01 / KRONE, Otto
Kötterstr. 22
49479 Laggenbeck / DE
 [2018/25]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/25]
Application number, filing date18154736.518.03.2011
[2018/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3335548
Date:20.06.2018
Language:DE
[2018/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:A01J5/017, A01J5/00, A01K1/12
[2018/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/06]
Former [2018/25]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:MELKZEUG UND MELKSTAND MIT EINEM SOLCHEN MELKZEUG[2018/25]
English:TEAT CUP AND A MILKING STALL INCLUDING SUCH A TEAT CUP[2018/25]
French:FAISCEAU TRAYEUR ET SALLE DE TRAITE POURVUE D'UN TEL FAISCEAU TRAYEUR[2018/25]
Examination procedure20.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/06]
20.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11712201.0  / EP2685808
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
01.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
01.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
01.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
19.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
22.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO0013495  (ALFA LAVAL AGRI AB [SE]; SJOELUND HANS MARTIN [SE]) [X] 1,7 * page 7, line 14 - page 8, line 11; figures 2,3 * [Y] 2-5;
 [X]DE3931769  (DUEVELSDORF ADOLF [DE]) [X] 1,7 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2001028021  (MARTIN ALAN [US]) [Y] 2-5 * the whole document *;
 [AD]WO9805201  (MAASLAND NV [NL]; FRANSEN RENE [NL]) [AD] 1-15 * page 6, line 30 - page 10, line 4; figures 1-10 *;
 [Y]DE4237949  (EICHLER MAX [DE]) [Y] 2-5 * the whole document *;
 [AD]EP0862360  (MAASLAND NV [NL]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0018] - [0021]; figures 1-10 *
by applicantEP0862360
 EP0647391