Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470138

EP3470138 - CATALYST FUEL ADDITIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 17.04.2019  [2019/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Opti-Innovations Limited
8 King Cross Street
Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2SH / GB
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Hale III, Edward Carroll
2212 B Richelieu Ave.
Roanoke, VA Virginia VA 24014 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Gilholm, Stephen Philip
IPheions Intellectual Property
Buzzard Office The Hawk Creative Business Park
Easingwold, York YO61 3FE / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18154991.602.02.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS201762570151P10.10.2017         Original published format: US 201762570151 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470138
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.06.2018
ClassificationInternational:B01J23/22, C10L1/30, C10L1/26, C10L1/12, B01J37/04, B01J27/198
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KATALYSATORKRAFTSTOFFADDITIV[2019/16]
English:CATALYST FUEL ADDITIVE[2019/16]
French:ADDITIF DE CARBURANT CATALYTIQUE[2019/16]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
02.02.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Documents cited:Search[X]US2010269403  (OYLER S DEBORAH [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0025] - [0029] * * paragraphs [0041] - [0048]; figures 1-11; claims 1,3,4,7,8 *;
 [A]US4221768  (INOUE AKIRA, et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2012001620  (BASF SE [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *