Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3335677

EP3335677 - HELICAL HYBRID STENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  18.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 06.02.2019  [2019/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medinol Ltd.
Kiryat Atidim, Bldg. 8
Tel Aviv 6158101 / IL
[2018/25]
Inventor(s)01 / RICHTER, Jacob
19 Mul Hayam Street
4692000 Arsuf / IL
02 / BELOBROVY, Igor
12 Moshe Sneh Street
4922351 Petah-Tiqwa / IL
03 / WEIZMAN, Oleg
11/11 Zalman Shenior Street
4636431 Herzliya / IL
 [2018/25]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[2018/25]
Application number, filing date18155804.014.03.2014
[2018/25]
Priority number, dateUS20131382915314.03.2013         Original published format: US201313829153
[2018/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3335677
Date:20.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/88, A61F2/91
[2018/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/06]
Former [2018/25]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SPIRALFÖRMIGER HYBRIDSTENT[2018/25]
English:HELICAL HYBRID STENT[2018/25]
French:ENDOPROTHÈSE HYBRIDE HÉLICOIDALE[2018/25]
Examination procedure14.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/06]
20.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14744147.1  / EP2967933
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
08.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[IY]US2009234433  (RICHTER JACOB [IL]) [I] 1-5,7-11,16-23,25,26 * the whole document * [Y] 6,10-15,24;
 [Y]EP2529706  (MEDINOL LTD [IL]) [Y] 10,13-15,24 * paragraph [0049]; claims 2,3,11,15 *;
 [Y]EP2526905  (MEDINOL LTD [IL]) [Y] 11 * claim 29 *;
 [Y]US2001032009  (LAYNE RICHARD [US], et al) [Y] 6,12 * abstract *
by applicantUS4733665
 US4800882
 US5282824
 US4856516
 US5116365
 US4886062
 US4969458
 US5019090
 US5102417
 US5104404
 US5161547
 US5383892
 US5449373
 US5733303
 US6503270
 US6355059
 US6723119
 US7141062
 US5836964
 US5997973
 US4142571
 US4281706
 US4489773
 US5381856