Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3349434

EP3349434 - RADIATION IMAGING APPARATUS AND RADIATION IMAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.11.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.01.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[2018/29]
Inventor(s)01 / IWASHITA, Atsushi
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / KAMESHIMA, Toshio
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / YAGI, Tomoyuki
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / TAKENAKA, Katsuro
c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
05 / OKADA, Hideyuki
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
06 / SATO, Sho
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
07 / SATO, Eriko
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
08 / RYU, Takuya
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
 [2018/29]
Representative(s)Williamson, Brian , et al
Canon Europe Limited
European Patent Department
3 The Square
Stockley Park
Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB
[2019/52]
Former [2018/29]Williamson, Brian , et al
Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park
Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB
Application number, filing date18155827.127.02.2014
[2018/29]
Priority number, dateJP2013004003028.02.2013         Original published format: JP 2013040030
[2018/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3349434
Date:18.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3349434
Date:25.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.06.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/32
[2018/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/09]
Former [2018/29]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:STRAHLUNGSABBILDUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND STRAHLUNGSABBILDUNGSSYSTEM[2018/29]
English:RADIATION IMAGING APPARATUS AND RADIATION IMAGING SYSTEM[2018/29]
French:APPAREIL DE RADIOLOGIE ET SYSTEME DE RADIOLOGIE[2018/29]
Examination procedure17.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/09]
18.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.2019Fee for grant paid
13.11.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.11.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14157067.1  / EP2773103
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
08.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
08.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2011104991  (KONICA MINOLTA MED & GRAPHIC [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0061]; figure 8 * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0015]; figure 7 *;
 [AD]WO0065825  (SIMAGE OY [FI], et al) [AD] 1-23 * page 19, line 22 - page 22, line 9; figures 8-11 *;
 [A]JP2011185622  (KONICA MINOLTA MED & GRAPHIC) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0112]; figures 7, 11-13 *;
 [A]US2003086523  (TASHIRO KAZUAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0074]; figure 1 *
by applicantJP2002543684