Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3361513

EP3361513 - SOLAR CELL MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2018/33]SOLAR CELL AND SOLAR CELL MODULE USING THE SAME
[2019/19]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.08.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.04.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.01.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 07336 / KR
[2018/33]
Inventor(s)01 / LIM, Chunghyun
IP Center, LG ELECTRONICS INC.
51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu
08592 Seoul / KR
 [2018/33]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2018/33]
Application number, filing date18156030.109.02.2018
[2018/33]
Priority number, dateKR2017001966313.02.2017         Original published format: KR 20170019663
[2018/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3361513
Date:15.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3361513
Date:18.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/0224, H01L31/05
[2018/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/07]
Former [2018/33]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SOLARZELLENMODUL[2019/19]
English:SOLAR CELL MODULE[2019/19]
French:MODULE DE CELLULE SOLAIRE[2019/19]
Former [2018/33]SOLARZELLE UND SOLARZELLENMODUL DAMIT
Former [2018/33]SOLAR CELL AND SOLAR CELL MODULE USING THE SAME
Former [2018/33]CELLULE SOLAIRE ET MODULE DE CELLULE SOLAIRE LA CONTENANT
Examination procedure28.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/07]
28.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.08.2019Fee for grant paid
07.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLT18.09.2019
NO18.12.2019
[2020/08]
Documents cited:Search[L]EP3142156  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [L] 1-4,10-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0065] , [0 67] , [0 94] , [0345] - [0354] * * figures 6,25,26 *;
 [X]EP2824712  (INVENTEC SOLAR ENERGY CORP [TW]) [X] 12-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0016] * * page 3 *;
 [XAI]WO2014176380  (SOLEXEL INC [US], et al) [X] 12,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0043] * * figure 4 * [A] 14 [I] 15;
 [A]US2011041908  (HARDER NILS-PETER [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 5 *