Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3338648

EP3338648 - SYSTEM FOR REPAIRING SOFT TISSUES USING NANOFIBER MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.08.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.04.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.01.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cayenne Medical, Inc.
16597 North 92nd Street, Suite 101
Scottsdale, AZ 85260 / US
[2019/39]
Former [2018/26]For all designated states
Cayenne Medical, Inc.
16597 North 92nd Street, Suite 101
Scottsdale, AZ 85260 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BAIRD, Kevin
16597 North 92nd Street Suite 101
Scottsdale, AZ 85260 / US
02 / HARPER, Derek
16597 North 92nd Street Suite 101
Scottsdale, AZ 85260 / US
03 / NASON, Kevin
16597 North 92nd Street Suite 101
Scottsdale, AZ 85260 / US
[2019/39]
Former [2018/26]01 / BAIRD, Kevin
16597 North 92nd Street Suite 101
Scottsdale, Arizona 85260 / US
02 / HARPER, Derek
16597 North 92nd Street Suite 101
Scottsdale, Arizona 85260 / US
03 / NASON, Kevin
16597 North 92nd Street Suite 101
Scottsdale, Arizona 85260 / US
Representative(s)Mays, Julie
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2019/39]
Former [2018/26]HGF Limited
Cavendish House
39-41 Waterloo Street
Birmingham, West Midlands B2 5PP / GB
Application number, filing date18156124.211.10.2013
[2018/26]
Priority number, dateUS201261713230P12.10.2012         Original published format: US 201261713230 P
[2018/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3338648
Date:27.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/26]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3338648
Date:25.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/04, A61B17/00
[2018/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/06]
Former [2018/26]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR REPARATUR VON WEICHGEWEBEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON NANOFASERMATERIAL[2018/26]
English:SYSTEM FOR REPAIRING SOFT TISSUES USING NANOFIBER MATERIAL[2018/26]
French:SYSTÈME DE RÉPARATION DE TISSUS MOUS À L'AIDE DE MATIÈRE À BASE DE NANOFIBRE[2018/26]
Examination procedure20.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/06]
20.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.08.2019Fee for grant paid
13.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13845008.5  / EP2906264
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
09.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
09.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
17.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US2012211543  (EUTENEUER CHARLES L [US]) [A] 1,3,4,6,8,10,11 * figures 4, 6, 8 * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0060] *;
 [AP]WO2013096224  (ROTATION MEDICAL INC [US]) [AP] 1,3,4,6,8,10,11 * figures 1, 8 * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0077] *;
 [A]US2008188936  (BALL ROBERT J [US] ET AL) [A] 1,9,10 * figures 24, 26 * * paragraph [0137] * * paragraph [0141] *;
 [A]US2011288566  (KUBIAK ERIK N [US]) [A] 1,5,10 * figures 17A, 18B * * paragraph [0123] * * paragraph [0127] *;
 [A]US2012101525  (JENSON MARK L [US] ET AL) [A] 1,5,10 * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047] *
by applicantUS2010292791
    - YOKOYA et al., "Tendon-Bone Insertion Repair and Regeneration Using Polyglycolic Acid Sheet in the Rabbit Rotator Cuff Injury Model", American Journal of Sports Medicine, (20080000), vol. 36, no. 7, pages 1298 - 1309
    - FUNAKOSHI et al., "Rotator Cuff Regeneration Using Chitin Fabric as an Acellular Matrix", Journal of Shoulder and Elbow Surgery, (20060000), vol. 15, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jse.2005.05.012, pages 112 - 118, XP005245266

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jse.2005.05.012
    - MACGILLIVRAY et al., "Biomechanical Evaluation of a Rotator Cuff Defect Model Augmented with a Bioresorbable Scaffold in Goats", Journal of Shoulder and Elbow Surgery, (20060000), vol. 15, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jse.2005.11.009, pages 639 - 644, XP005748037

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jse.2005.11.009
    - DERWIN et al., "Rotator Cuff Repair Augmentation in a Canine Model with Use of a Woven Poly-L-Lactide Device", Journal of Bone and Joint Surgery A, (20090000), vol. 91, no. 5, pages 1159 - 1171
    - MOFFAT et al., "Novel Nanofiber-Based Scaffold for Rotator Cuff Repair and Augmentation", Tissue Eng Part A, (20080000), vol. 14, pages 1 - 12