Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473200

EP3473200 - ABLATION CATHETER WITH MICROELECTRODE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ABLATION CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
25.10.2019Amendment by applicant 
25.10.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
25.10.2019Change - designated statespublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VascoMed GmbH
Hertzallee 1
79589 Binzen / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Kaufmann, Ralf
Dinkelberg Strasse 4G
79540 Lörrach / DE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Keck, Hans-Georg
Biotronik Corporate Services SE
Corporate Intellectual Property
Sieversufer 7 - 9
12359 Berlin / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18156706.614.02.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateDE20171012465123.10.2017         Original published format: DE102017124651
[2019/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473200
Date:24.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/14, // A61B17/00, A61B5/0245, A61B5/042, A61B5/053, A61B18/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/48]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ABLATIONSKATHETER MIT MIKROELEKTRODE UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES ABLATIONSKATHETERS[2019/17]
English:ABLATION CATHETER WITH MICROELECTRODE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ABLATION CATHETER[2019/17]
French:CATHÉTER D'ABLATION MUNI DE MICRO-ÉLECTRODE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN CATHÉTER D'ABLATION[2019/17]
Examination procedure23.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/48]
23.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2014081111  (TUN ZAYA [US], et al) [X] 1,5,10,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [00 6] , [00 7] , [00 8] , [0 13] , [0 59] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0053] * [Y] 2-4,6-9,12,14 [I] 11;
 [YA]EP3040043  (BIOSENSE WEBSTER ISRAEL LTD [IL]) [Y] 2-4,6-9,12,14 * paragraphs [0018] , [0 35] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0041] * * figures 4, 5A-5E * [A] 1,5,10,11,13;
 [YA]EP3009092  (BIOSENSE WEBSTER ISRAEL LTD [IL]) [Y] 3,4,6-9,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0 10] , [0 11] , [0 14] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034] * [A] 1,2,5,10,11,13,14;
 [YA]DE10008918  (BIOTRONIK MESS & THERAPIEG [DE]) [Y] 3,4,6-9,12 * abstract * * column 2, line 15 - line 29 * * column 3, line 13 - line 24 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 5 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 5 * [A] 1,2,5,10,11,13,14;
 [YA]WO2017070559  (ST JUDE CARDIOLOGY DIV INC [US]) [Y] 6-9,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0138] , [ 215] , [ 216] , [ 217] * [A] 1-5,10,11,13,14;
 [A]WO2015183635  (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *
by applicantUS2004092806
 US2008243214
 EP3015064
 EP2380517