blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3388531 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3388531



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 90
17.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.04.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
17.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
17.04.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
17.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.10.2018 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
19.09.2018 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
01.08.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
27.07.2018 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
27.07.2018 European search opinion Search / examination 3
27.07.2018 European search report Search / examination 1
27.07.2018 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
26.06.2018 Search started Search / examination 1
07.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.06.2018 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 1
07.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.06.2018 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
19.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.04.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
19.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.04.2018 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
03.04.2018 Deficiencies in sequence listing Search / examination 2
29.03.2018 Invitation to file claims Search / examination 1
19.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.02.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.02.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
19.02.2018 Description Search / examination 15
19.02.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.02.2018 Drawings Search / examination 4
19.02.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4
09.01.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 23