Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3409404

EP3409404 - EDGE MILLING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Metabowerke GmbH
Metabo-Allee 1
72622 Nürtingen / DE
[2018/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Schmidberger-Brinek, Susanne
Am Heimensteig 6
72587 Römerstein / DE
 [2018/49]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2018/49]
Application number, filing date18157802.221.02.2018
[2018/49]
Priority number, dateDE20171011223402.06.2017         Original published format: DE102017112234
[2018/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3409404
Date:05.12.2018
Language:DE
[2018/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.09.2018
ClassificationInternational:B23C3/12
[2018/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Former [2018/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KANTENFRÄSMASCHINE[2018/49]
English:EDGE MILLING MACHINE[2018/49]
French:MACHINE À FRAISER LES CHANFREINS[2018/49]
Examination procedure05.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
05.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2015010675  (AIRBUS DEFENCE & SPACE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * page 11, line 29 - page 13, line 12 * * figure 2 *;
 [X]US2015367469  (KOBAYASHI SHIGEKI [JP]) [X] 1 * page 1, column R, line L - page 2, column L, line 5 * * figure 1 *;
 [AD]EP1340574  (TRUMPF GRUESCH AG [CH]) [AD] 1 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0019] * * figure - *;
 [AD]EP1984139  (DAE SUNG GOLDEN TECHNOLOGY [KR]) [AD] 1 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0060] * * figure - *;
 [A]CN203061942U  (SHANGHAI GIRET MACHINERY EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE102012017505  (WILSER ALEXANDER [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0055] * * figure 1 *