Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471148

EP3471148 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo
105-8001 / JP
For all designated states
Toshiba Electronic Devices & Storage Corporation
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo, 105-0023 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / YAMASHITA, Hiroaki
c/o IP Div. Toshiba Electronic
Devices & Storage Corporation
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo, 105-0023 / JP
02 / ONO, Syotaro
c/o IP Div. Toshiba Electronic
Devices & Storage Corporation
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo, 105-0023 / JP
03 / ICHIJO, Hisao
c/o IP Div. Toshiba Electronic
Devices & Storage Corporation
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo, 105-0023 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18157872.521.02.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateJP2017019770511.10.2017         Original published format: JP 2017197705
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471148
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.08.2018
ClassificationInternational:H01L29/78, H01L29/06, H01L29/423
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT[2019/16]
English:SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR[2019/16]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
21.02.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
22.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Documents cited:Search[A]US2010102381  (SAITO WATARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-6,10-14 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0063]; figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0120]; figure 17 *;
 [A]WO2011007560  (FUJI ELECTRIC SYSTEMS CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2009159927  (WILLMEROTH ARMIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0087]; figures 27-28 *;
 [A]US2012074461  (ONO SYOTARO [JP], et al) [A] 6-8,10 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1A-1B, 2 *;
 [A]US2015115355  (HIRLER FRANZ [DE], et al) [A] 6,7,9 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0046]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2016118492  (ASADA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 6,7,9 * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0083]; figures 4, 5, 11 *