Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3471148 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3471148



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 299
22.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
22.07.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 13
22.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 15
22.07.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 47
22.07.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 48
22.07.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
22.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.04.2019 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
24.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
29.08.2018 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.08.2018 European search opinion Search / examination 3
29.08.2018 European search report Search / examination 2
29.08.2018 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
13.08.2018 Search started Search / examination 1
26.04.2018 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
23.04.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 60
21.02.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.02.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
21.02.2018 Claims Search / examination 12
21.02.2018 Description Search / examination 45
21.02.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.02.2018 Drawings Search / examination 28
21.02.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5