Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3471148


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.02.2020 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.07.2019 Amendment by applicant
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
15.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
22.02.2018 Change - representative