Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3346669

EP3346669 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENABLING MACHINE TO MACHINE COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Interdigital Patent Holdings, Inc.
200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300
Wilmington, DE 19809-3727 / US
[2018/28]
Inventor(s)01 / Cha, Inhyok
Joong-Ang Heights Village, 102-Dong 202-HO 14-1
Samsung-Dong, Gangnam-Ku
SEOUL / KR
02 / Shah, Yogendra C
10 Regency Court
Exton, Pennsylvania 19341 / US
03 / Schmidt, Andreas U.
Dillenburger Strasse 13
60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE
04 / Meyerstein, Michael V
27 Mayfields
Martlesham Heath Ipswich, 1P5 3TU / GB
 [2018/28]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
[2018/28]
Application number, filing date18159051.421.01.2009
[2018/28]
Priority number, dateUS2008002212718.01.2008         Original published format: US 22127
US2008002516331.01.2008         Original published format: US 25163
US2008003163026.02.2008         Original published format: US 31630
US2008012779214.05.2008         Original published format: US 127792
US2008006072511.06.2008         Original published format: US 60725
US2008014156930.12.2008         Original published format: US 141569
US2008014158630.12.2008         Original published format: US 141586
[2018/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3346669
Date:11.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04L29/08, H04W8/24, G06F21/00, H04M1/725, G06F21/57, H04W4/00, H04W24/00, H04W12/08, H04W4/70, // H04W12/00, H04W8/06
[2018/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/28]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG VON MASCHINE-ZU-MASCHINE-KOMMUNIKATION[2018/28]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ENABLING MACHINE TO MACHINE COMMUNICATION[2018/28]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT UNE COMMUNICATION MACHINE À MACHINE[2018/28]
Examination procedure12.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/28]
19.02.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2019/28]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09701696.8  / EP2245829
EP15193998.0  / EP3010205
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
28.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
28.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
28.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201911   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project;Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects;Feasibility Study on Remote Management of USIM Application on M2M Equipment; (Release 8)", 3GPP DRAFT; S3-070900-TR33812-V002, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20071012), vol. SA WG3, XP050280307 [X] 1,3,6,7,14-16 * figure 2 * * page 10, line 13 * * page 12, part 5.2.1.3, points 1 et 4 * * page 8, line 5 - line 14 * * page 9, line 16 - line 17 * [I] 2,4,5,8-13
 [XI]  - ERICSSON, "Concept of intial USIM application installation in the M2M equipment", 3GPP DRAFT; S3-070726 DISCUSSION_CONCEPT, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20071001), vol. SA WG3, no. Munich; 20071008, XP050280186 [X] 1,3,6,7,14-16 * the whole document * [I] 2,4,5,8-13
 [IP]  - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project;Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects;Feasibility Study on Remote Management of USIM Application on M2M Equipment;(Release 8)", 3GPP DRAFT; S3-081174-V1-33812-110_CLEAN, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20081015), no. Kyoto; 20081015, XP050334388 [IP] 1-16 * figure x * * section 5.2.2.6.1 *