blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3355255 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201580040104 EP15794475 EP18156948 EP18156953 EP18159376



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018276608Global Dossier 27.09.2018A1
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
US201615316249 05.12.2016
US201815993208 30.05.2018
WO2015EP62380 03.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018276607Global Dossier 27.09.2018A1
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
US201615316249 05.12.2016
WO2015EP62380 03.06.2015
US201815993097 30.05.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018276606Global Dossier 27.09.2018A1
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
US201615316249 05.12.2016
WO2015EP62380 03.06.2015
US201815992899 30.05.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10086999Global Dossier 02.10.2018B2
US2018075402 15.03.2018A1
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
WO2015EP62380 03.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20170013973Global Dossier 07.02.2017A
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
WO2015EP62380 03.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2017518940Global Dossier 13.07.2017A
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
WO2015EP62380 03.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3385893Global Dossier 10.10.2018A1
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
WO2015EP62380 03.06.2015
EP15794475 03.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3376450Global Dossier 19.09.2018A1
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
WO2015EP62380 03.06.2015
EP15794475 03.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3152712Global Dossier 12.04.2017A2
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
WO2015EP62380 03.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN106662874Global Dossier 10.05.2017A
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
WO2015EP62380 03.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2950971Global Dossier 10.12.2015A1
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
WO2015EP62380 03.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3355255Global Dossier 01.08.2018A1
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
WO2015EP62380 03.06.2015
EP15794475 03.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2015270518 02.02.2017A2
AU2015270518 19.01.2017A1
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
WO2015EP62380 03.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112016028198 31.10.2017A2
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
WO2015EP62380 03.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB2565239 01.05.2019B
GB2565239 06.02.2019A
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
GB201509613 03.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB2565240 01.05.2019B
GB2565240 06.02.2019A
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
GB201509613 03.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB2565241 01.05.2019B
GB2565241 06.02.2019A
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
GB201509613 03.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL263579D 31.01.2019D0
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
WO2015EP62380 03.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL263580D 31.01.2019D0
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
WO2015EP62380 03.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL263581D 31.01.2019D0
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
WO2015EP62380 03.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2016015943 26.05.2017A
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
WO2015EP62380 03.06.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SG11201610025Y 29.12.2016A
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
WO2015EP62380 03.06.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2015185628Global Dossier 07.04.2016A3
WO2015185628 10.12.2015A2
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CL2016003120 08.09.2017A1
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB2528568 19.12.2018B
GB2528568 27.01.2016A
GB201509613D 15.07.2015D0
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB201409883D 16.07.2014D0
Priority number Date
GB201409883 03.06.2014
TypeType Earlier application
 EP3152712