Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3355255

EP3355255 - METHODS, SYSTEMS AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING MOVEMENT OF TRANSPORTING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.09.2018
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  29.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ocado Innovation Limited
1 Trident Place Mosquito Way
Hatfield, HERTS AL10 9UL / GB
[2018/31]
Inventor(s)01 / STADIE, Robert
Ocado Innovation Limited, The Legal Department 1
Trident Place, Mosquito Way
Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB
02 / WHELAN, Matthew
Ocado Innovation Limited The Legal Department,1
Trident Place, Mosquito Way
Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB
03 / BRETT, Christopher
Ocado Innovation Limited, The Legal Department 1
Trident Place, Mosquito Way
Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB
 [2018/31]
Representative(s)Levine, Benjamin Miles , et al
Ocado Innovation Limited
c/o Impetus IP Limited
Suite 31, West Devon Business Park
Brook Lane
Tavistock, Devon PL19 9DP / GB
[2018/31]
Application number, filing date18159376.503.06.2015
[2018/31]
Priority number, dateGB2014000988303.06.2014         Original published format: GB 201409883
[2018/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3355255
Date:01.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/08, B65G1/137, // B65G1/04, G05D1/00
[2018/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/41]
Former [2018/31]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, SYSTEME UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DER BEWEGUNG VON TRANSPORTVORRICHTUNGEN[2018/31]
English:METHODS, SYSTEMS AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING MOVEMENT OF TRANSPORTING DEVICES[2018/31]
French:PROCÉDÉS, SYSTÈMES ET APPAREIL POUR COMMANDER LE MOUVEMENT DE DISPOSITIFS DE TRANSPORT[2018/31]
Examination procedure01.03.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.08.2018Examination requested  [2018/41]
28.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15794475.2  / EP3152712
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 04