Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470010

EP3470010 - DENTAL RESTORATIVE SYSTEM AND COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer Dental Inc.
1900 Aston Avenue
Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US
For all designated states
Salama, Maurice
560 Chestnut Rose Lane
Atlanta, GA 30327 / US
For all designated states
Salama, Henry
7814 Conwell Road
Glenside, PA 19038 / US
For all designated states
Garber, David
355 Enclave Circle
Atlanta, GA 30342-2080 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / SALAMA, Maurice
560 Chestnut Rose Lane
Atlanta, Georgia 30327 / US
02 / SALAMA, Henry
7814 Conwell Road
Glenside, Pennsylvania 19038 / US
03 / GARBER, David
355 Enclave Circle
Atlanta, Georgia 30342-2080 / US
04 / BASSETT, Jeffrey A.
1340 Palomar Place
Vista, California 92084 / US
05 / WOOLF, Kent
1440 Grey Oaks Ct.
Oceanside, California 92056 / US
06 / HOWLETT, Charles W.
1404 Bluebird Canyon Drive
Laguna Beach, California 92651 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18159700.614.06.2006
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS20050691685P17.06.2005         Original published format: US 691685 P
US20050714641P07.09.2005         Original published format: US 714641 P
US2006038057727.04.2006         Original published format: US 380577
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470010
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61C8/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:ZAHNRESTAURATIONSSYSTEM UND -KOMPONENTEN[2019/16]
English:DENTAL RESTORATIVE SYSTEM AND COMPONENTS[2019/16]
French:SYSTÈME ET COMPOSANTS DE RESTAURATION DENTAIRE[2019/16]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06773136.4  / EP1898827
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
02.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
02.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
02.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
02.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
02.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
02.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
02.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
02.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
02.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201813   M06   Fee paid on   31.12.2018
30.06.201914   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5915968  (KIRSCH AXEL [DE] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,8-15 * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 55; figure - *;
 [X]US2004121286  (ARAVENA INES M [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3,11-15 * paragraphs [0025] - [0037]; figure - *;
 [X]USD477877S  (WHITEHEAD GEORGE M [US]) [X] 1-4,8-15 * figure - *