blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3357568 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201080009849 EP10713293 EP18159928



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9097626Global Dossier 04.08.2015B2
US2015153256 04.06.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201113273603 14.10.2011
EP09157849 14.04.2009
WO2010CH00092 09.04.2010
US201514614464 05.02.2015
US201414153352 13.01.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8986612Global Dossier 24.03.2015B2
US2014127082 08.05.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201113273603 14.10.2011
EP09157849 14.04.2009
WO2010CH00092 09.04.2010
US201414153352 13.01.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8641971Global Dossier 04.02.2014B2
US2012034615 09.02.2012A1
Priority number Date
EP09157849 14.04.2009
WO2010CH00092 09.04.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5968218BGlobal Dossier 10.08.2016B2
JP2012523317 04.10.2012A
Priority number Date
EP09157849 14.04.2009
WO2010CH00092 09.04.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2419204Global Dossier 22.02.2012A2
Priority number Date
EP10713293 09.04.2010
EP09157849 14.04.2009
WO2010CH00092 09.04.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102341162BGlobal Dossier 01.04.2015B
CN102341162 01.02.2012A
Priority number Date
EP09157849 14.04.2009
WO2010CH00092 09.04.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2752715Global Dossier 01.05.2018C
CA2752715 21.10.2010A1
Priority number Date
EP09157849 14.04.2009
WO2010CH00092 09.04.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3357568Global Dossier 08.08.2018A1
Priority number Date
EP10713293 09.04.2010
EP09157849 14.04.2009
WO2010CH00092 09.04.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2010237530B 21.04.2016B2
AU2010237530 11.08.2011A1
Priority number Date
EP09157849 14.04.2009
WO2010CH00092 09.04.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI1014469 27.06.2017A2
Priority number Date
EP09157849 14.04.2009
WO2010CH00092 09.04.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2549443 27.04.2015C2
RU2011146000 20.05.2013A
Priority number Date
EP09157849 14.04.2009
WO2010CH00092 09.04.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ZA201105484 25.04.2012B
Priority number Date
EP09157849 14.04.2009
WO2010CH00092 09.04.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2010118539Global Dossier 27.01.2011A3
WO2010118539 21.10.2010A2
Priority number Date
EP09157849 14.04.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20120017038Global Dossier 27.02.2012A
Priority number Date
EP09157849 14.04.2009
TypeType Earlier application
 EP2419204