Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3357568

EP3357568 - HIFU INDUCED CAVITATION WITH REDUCED POWER THRESHOLD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biocartis NV
Generaal De Wittelaan 11 B3
2800 Mechelen / BE
[2018/32]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN DOORN, Arie R.
c/o High Tech Campus 7
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / DE JONG, Michiel
c/o High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2018/32]
Representative(s)Grimm, Siegfried
E. Blum & Co. AG
Vorderberg 11
8044 Zürich / CH
[2018/32]
Application number, filing date18159928.309.04.2010
[2018/32]
Priority number, dateEP2009015784914.04.2009         Original published format: EP 09157849
[2018/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3357568
Date:08.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.2018
ClassificationInternational:B01F11/02
[2018/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/10]
Former [2018/32]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:HIFU-INDUZIERTE KAVITATION MIT VERRINGERTER LEISTUNGSSCHWELLE[2018/32]
English:HIFU INDUCED CAVITATION WITH REDUCED POWER THRESHOLD[2018/32]
French:CAVITATION INDUITE PAR HIFU AVEC SEUIL DE PUISSANCE RÉDUIT[2018/32]
Examination procedure25.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/10]
25.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10713293.8  / EP2419204
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
05.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
05.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
05.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
05.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
05.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
30.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2008031094  (LAUGHARN JAMES A JR [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1,7 * * paragraph [0066] *;
 [Y]US2006264809  (HANSMANN DOUGLAS R [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0073] * * figure 2B *;
 [A]US2006158956  (LAUGHARN JAMES A JR [US] ET AL LAUGHARN JR JAMES A [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0138] * * paragraph [0174] * * figure 9 *;
 [A]JP2007010345  (OLYMPUS CORP) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6699711  (HAHN THOMAS [DE] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0353365  (CHIBA SHIGERU) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *