blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3388996

EP3388996 - PORTABLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE SALES, PROVISIONING, AND USER CARE VENDING KIOSK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  12.01.2024
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.10.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.04.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  14.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2024Refusal of applicationpublished on 14.02.2024  [2024/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Accenture Global Solutions Limited
3 Grand Canal Plaza
Grand Canal Street Upper
Dublin 4 / IE
[2018/42]
Inventor(s)01 / ENGLES, Edward
1722 U St NW
Appartment D
Washington DC 20009 / US
02 / EGAN, Todd
31 Park Way
Morris Plain NJ 07950 / US
03 / WHYMAN, Tammy
907D Seneca Road
Great Falls, VA 22066 / US
 [2018/42]
Representative(s)Swindell & Pearson Limited
48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
[2018/42]
Application number, filing date18160771.408.03.2018
[2018/42]
Priority number, dateUS20171548502211.04.2017         Original published format: US201715485022
[2018/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3388996
Date:17.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.05.2018
ClassificationIPC:G06Q30/00, G06Q30/08, G06Q50/30, G06Q30/02
[2018/42]
CPC:
G06Q30/0631 (EP,US); G06Q30/0643 (CN); G06Q20/18 (US);
G06F8/65 (CN); G06Q30/00 (EP,US); G06Q30/016 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0237 (EP,US); G06Q30/08 (EP,US); G06Q50/40 (EP,US);
H04W8/24 (US); G06F11/1402 (US); G06F3/0482 (US);
G06V40/172 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/21]
Former [2018/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERKAUF VON TRAGBAREN ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN, VERSORGUNG UND AUTOMAT ZUM VERKAUF VON BENUTZERBETREUUNG[2018/42]
English:PORTABLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE SALES, PROVISIONING, AND USER CARE VENDING KIOSK[2018/42]
French:VENTE ET FOURNITURE DE DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE PORTABLE ET KIOSQUE DE VENTE D'HYGIÈNE D'UTILISATEUR[2018/42]
Examination procedure10.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/21]
12.04.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.10.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.02.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.01.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2023Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.06.2023
26.06.2023Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
26.09.2023Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/07]
06.10.2023Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
12.03.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
12.01.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
03.01.2024Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2001319272  (YUUDEN COMMUNICATION KK);
 [A]US2010188222  (IRMSCHER JULIA [DE], et al);
 [I]US2010228676  (LIBRIZZI MICHAEL [US], et al);
 [I]US2013198144  (BOWLES MARK VINCENT [US]);
 [A]WO2016195648  (HEWLETT PACKARD ENTPR DEV LP [US])
ExaminationUS2016364939
 US2017256119
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.