Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3376112

EP3376112 - CLOSED FIREPLACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.09.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Spartherm Feuerungstechnik GmbH
Maschweg 38
49324 Melle / DE
[2018/38]
Inventor(s)01 / ROKOSSA, Gerhard Manfred
Maschweg 10
49143 Bissendorf / DE
02 / SCHMATLOCH, Volker
An der Berglust 14
49324 Melle / DE
 [2018/38]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/38]
Application number, filing date18161569.113.03.2018
[2018/38]
Priority number, dateDE201720101465U14.03.2017         Original published format: DE 202017101465 U
[2018/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3376112
Date:19.09.2018
Language:DE
[2018/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.07.2018
ClassificationInternational:F24B1/02, F23D5/02
[2018/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Former [2018/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GESCHLOSSENE FEUERSTÄTTE[2018/38]
English:CLOSED FIREPLACE[2018/38]
French:LIEU DE L'INCENDIE FERMÉ[2018/38]
Examination procedure18.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
18.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
19.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US4373905  (HETTICH ALLEN J [US]) [X] 1,2,7,11 * column 1, line 6 - line 8; figures 1-4 * * column 3, line 8 - line 56 * * column 3, line 63 - line 65 * [A] 6,10 [I] 8;
 [IA]US4351316  (KROLL WALTER) [I] 1,8,11 * column 1, line 5 - line 7; figures 1-6 * * column 3, line 34 - line 47 * * column 3, line 58 - line 60 * * column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 50 * * column 6, line 1 - line 5 * * column 6, line 44 - column 7, line 5 * * column 8, line 32 - line 35 * [A] 9;
 [I]DE1153503  (KUEHLAPP G M B H) [I] 1-3 * column 1, line 1 - line 11; figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 9 * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 28 * * column 4, line 47 - line 58 *;
 [I]US2313568  (MILLER JOHN W) [I] 1,11 * page 1, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 4; figure 1 * * page 1, column 2, line 13 - page 2, column 1, line 6 *;
 [A]JPS58137252U  (...) [A] 3 * figures 1-6 *