Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3376112


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.09.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
23.07.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
21.06.2019 First examination report
14.06.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.04.2019 Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
22.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.03.2019 Change - designated states published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
19.03.2019 Amendment by applicant
17.08.2018 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
13.03.2018 Change - representative