blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3355483

EP3355483 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING BEAMFORMING PARAMETERS IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND TO A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2020
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.02.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  29.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 17.08.2022  [2022/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastraße 27c
80686 München / DE
[2018/31]
Inventor(s)01 / KEUSGEN, Wilhelm
Schauensteiner Weg 7a
14089 Berlin / DE
02 / PETER, Michael
Bremer Straße 64
10551 Berlin / DE
03 / KORTKE, Andreas
Oststraße 11
12487 Berlin / DE
 [2019/48]
Former [2018/31]01 / KREUSGEN, Wilhelm
Schauensteiner Weg 7a
14089 Berlin / DE
02 / PETER, Michael
Bremer Straße 64
10551 Berlin / DE
03 / KORTKE, Andreas
Oststraße 11
12487 Berlin / DE
Representative(s)Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[2018/31]
Application number, filing date18161601.229.02.2012
[2018/31]
Priority number, dateUS20111304594411.03.2011         Original published format: US201113045944
[2018/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3355483
Date:01.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3355483
Date:04.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.06.2018
ClassificationIPC:H04B7/04, H04B7/06, H04B7/08, H04B7/0413, H04B7/0456
[2019/14]
CPC:
H04B7/0695 (EP,US); H04B7/0482 (US); H04B7/088 (EP,US);
H04B7/0413 (EP,US); H04B7/0465 (EP,US); H04B7/0617 (EP,US);
H04B7/0669 (EP,US); H04B7/0691 (EP,US); H04B7/0874 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2018/31]H04B7/04, H04B7/06, H04B7/08, H04B7/0413
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/11]
Former [2018/31]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON STRAHLFORMUNGSPARAMETERN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND ZU EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2018/31]
English:METHOD FOR DETERMINING BEAMFORMING PARAMETERS IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND TO A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2018/31]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTERMINER DES PARAMÈTRES DE FORMATION DE FAISCEAU DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET VERS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2018/31]
Examination procedure30.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/11]
30.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.2019Fee for grant paid
23.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12706590.2  / EP2684296
EP14154729.9  / EP2741429
Opposition(s)05.06.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
07.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.02.2012
AL04.09.2019
AT04.09.2019
CY04.09.2019
CZ04.09.2019
DK04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
MC04.09.2019
MK04.09.2019
MT04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
SI04.09.2019
SK04.09.2019
SM04.09.2019
TR04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
IS05.01.2020
PT06.01.2020
BE29.02.2020
CH29.02.2020
IE29.02.2020
LI29.02.2020
LU29.02.2020
[2022/33]
Former [2022/27]HU29.02.2012
AL04.09.2019
AT04.09.2019
CY04.09.2019
CZ04.09.2019
DK04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
MC04.09.2019
MT04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
SI04.09.2019
SK04.09.2019
SM04.09.2019
TR04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
IS05.01.2020
PT06.01.2020
BE29.02.2020
CH29.02.2020
IE29.02.2020
LI29.02.2020
LU29.02.2020
Former [2021/13]AL04.09.2019
AT04.09.2019
CZ04.09.2019
DK04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
MC04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
SI04.09.2019
SK04.09.2019
SM04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
IS05.01.2020
PT06.01.2020
BE29.02.2020
CH29.02.2020
IE29.02.2020
LI29.02.2020
LU29.02.2020
Former [2021/08]AL04.09.2019
AT04.09.2019
CZ04.09.2019
DK04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
MC04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
SI04.09.2019
SK04.09.2019
SM04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
IS05.01.2020
PT06.01.2020
CH29.02.2020
IE29.02.2020
LI29.02.2020
LU29.02.2020
Former [2020/52]AL04.09.2019
AT04.09.2019
CZ04.09.2019
DK04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
MC04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
SI04.09.2019
SK04.09.2019
SM04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
IS05.01.2020
PT06.01.2020
CH29.02.2020
LI29.02.2020
LU29.02.2020
Former [2020/50]AL04.09.2019
AT04.09.2019
CZ04.09.2019
DK04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
MC04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
SI04.09.2019
SK04.09.2019
SM04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
IS05.01.2020
PT06.01.2020
LU29.02.2020
Former [2020/48]AL04.09.2019
AT04.09.2019
CZ04.09.2019
DK04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
SI04.09.2019
SK04.09.2019
SM04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
IS05.01.2020
PT06.01.2020
LU29.02.2020
Former [2020/37]AL04.09.2019
AT04.09.2019
CZ04.09.2019
DK04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
SI04.09.2019
SK04.09.2019
SM04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
IS05.01.2020
PT06.01.2020
Former [2020/36]AL04.09.2019
AT04.09.2019
CZ04.09.2019
DK04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
SK04.09.2019
SM04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
IS05.01.2020
PT06.01.2020
Former [2020/27]AL04.09.2019
AT04.09.2019
CZ04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
SK04.09.2019
SM04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
PT06.01.2020
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/25]AL04.09.2019
AT04.09.2019
CZ04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
SK04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
PT06.01.2020
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/23]AL04.09.2019
AT04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
PL04.09.2019
RO04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
PT06.01.2020
Former [2020/22]AL04.09.2019
EE04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
PT06.01.2020
Former [2020/20]AL04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
NL04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
Former [2020/15]AL04.09.2019
ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
Former [2020/12]ES04.09.2019
FI04.09.2019
HR04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
LV04.09.2019
RS04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
GR05.12.2019
Former [2020/10]FI04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
SE04.09.2019
BG04.12.2019
NO04.12.2019
Former [2020/09]FI04.09.2019
LT04.09.2019
NO04.12.2019
Former [2020/08]LT04.09.2019
NO04.12.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2037594  (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0021] - [0027]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO2009093870  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0040] - [0052]; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2009189812  (XIA PENGFEI [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0059]; figure 5 *;
 [A]US2009232240  (LAKKIS ISMAIL [US]) [A] 1-4* paragraphs [0084] , [ 0096] - [0099]; figure 3 *
by applicant   - CHUNG, PEI-JUNG; BOHME, J.F., "Recursive EM and SAGE-inspired algorithms with application to DOA estimation", Signal Processing, IEEE Transactions, (20050000), vol. 53, no. 8, pages 2664 - 2677
    - SCHMIDT, R., "Multiple emitter location and signal parameter estimation", Antennas and Propagation, IEEE Transactions, (19860000), vol. 34, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/TAP.1986.1143830, pages 276 - 280, XP055201292

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TAP.1986.1143830
    - STOICA, P.; SHARMAN, K.C., "Maximum likelihood methods for direction-of-arrival estimation", Acoustics, Speech and Signal Processing, IEEE Transactions, (19900000), vol. 38, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1109/29.57542, pages 1132 - 1143, XP055311055

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/29.57542
    - HEATH, R.W., JR.; PAULRAJ, A., "Multiple antenna arrays for transmitter diversity and space-time coding", Communications, 1999, ICC '99, 1999 IEEE International Conference, (19990000), vol. 1, pages 36 - 40, XP002163281
    - DAMMANN, A.; RAULEFS, R.; KAISER, S., "Beamforming in combination with space-time diversity for broadband OFDM systems", Communications, 2002. ICC 2002. IEEE International Conference, (20020000), doi:doi:10.1109/ICC.2002.996838, pages 165 - 171, XP010589479

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.2002.996838
    - DAMMANN, A; RAULEFS, R.; KAISER, S., "Beamforming in combination with space-time diversity for broadband OFDM systems", Communications, 2002. ICC 2002. IEEE International Conference, (20020000), doi:doi:10.1109/ICC.2002.996838, pages 165 - 171, XP010589479

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.2002.996838
    - MORELOS-ZARAGOZA, R.H.; GHAVAMI, M., "Combined beamforming and space-time block coding with a sparse array antenna", Wireless Personal Multimedia Communications, 2002. The 5th International Symposium, (20020000), vol. 2, pages 432 - 434, XP010619124
    - HEATH, R.W., JR.; PAULRAJ, A., "Multiple antenna arrays for transmitter diversity. and space-time coding", Communications, 1999. ICC '99. 1999 IEEE International Conference, (19990000), vol. l, pages 36 - 40, XP001020960
    - WU, SAU-HSUAN; CHIU, LIN-KAI; LIN, KO-YEN; CHUNG, SHYH-JONG, "Planar arrays hybrid beamforming for SDMA in millimeter wave applications", Personal, Indoor and Mobile Radio Communications, 2008. PIMRC 2008. IEEE 19th International Symposium, (20080000), doi:doi:10.1109/PIMRC.2008.4699888, pages 1 - 6, XP031371754

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PIMRC.2008.4699888
    - WU, SAU-HSUAN; LIN, KO-YEN; CHIU, LIN-KAI, "Hybrid beamforming using convex optimization for SDMA in millimeter wave radio", Personal, Indoor and Mobile Radio Communications, 2009 IEEE 20th International Symposium, (20090000), pages 823 - 827, XP031659794
    - "THousand Element Array (THEA", SMOLDERS, A.B.; KANT, G.W., Antennas and Propagation Society International Symposium, IEEE, (20000000), vol. 1, pages 162 - 165
    - LOVE, D.J; HEATH, R.W., JR., "Equal gain transmission in multiple-input multiple-output wireless systems", Communications, IEEE Transactions, (20030000), vol. 51, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1109/TCOMM.2003.814195, pages 1102 - 1110, XP011099044

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOMM.2003.814195
    - FRANK, R.; ZADOFF, S.; HEIMILLER, R., "Phase shift pulse codes with good periodic correlation properties", Information Theory (Corresp.), IRE Transactions, (19620000), vol. 8, no. 6, pages 381 - 382
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.