Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3407673

EP3407673 - MOBILE NETWORK TRAFFIC COORDINATION ACROSS MULTIPLE APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.10.2019
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.02.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.12.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  26.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2019New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent 
21.10.2019New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seven Networks, LLC
2660 East End Blvd. S.
Marshall TX 75672 / US
[2018/48]
Inventor(s)01 / BACKHOLM, Ari
Koivistontie 14 E
02140 Espoo / FI
02 / LUNA, Michael
2100 Seaport Boulevard
Redwood City, California 94063 / US
03 / YLINEN, Heikki
Numersinkatu 11 A 8
02600 Espoo / FI
 [2018/48]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[2019/47]
Former [2018/48]Leach, James , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
Application number, filing date18162765.425.05.2011
[2018/48]
Priority number, dateUS201036787010P26.07.2010         Original published format: US 36787010 P
US201036787110P26.07.2010         Original published format: US 36787110 P
US201040884610P01.11.2010         Original published format: US 40884610 P
US201040882010P01.11.2010         Original published format: US 40882010 P
US201040882610P01.11.2010         Original published format: US 40882610 P
US201040883910P01.11.2010         Original published format: US 40883910 P
US201040882910P01.11.2010         Original published format: US 40882910 P
US201040885410P01.11.2010         Original published format: US 40885410 P
US201040885810P01.11.2010         Original published format: US 40885810 P
US201041602010P22.11.2010         Original published format: US 41602010 P
US201041603310P22.11.2010         Original published format: US 41603310 P
US201161430828P07.01.2011         Original published format: US 201161430828 P
[2018/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3407673
Date:28.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3407673
Date:20.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04W88/06, H04W28/02, H04W52/02, H04W28/16, H04L12/12, H04L12/24, H04L29/08, G06F1/32, H04W24/02, H04W72/04, H04M3/42, H04W4/18
[2018/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/03]
Former [2018/48]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:KOORDINIERUNG EINES MOBILNETZWERKVERKEHRS ZWISCHEN MEHREREN ANWENDUNGEN[2018/48]
English:MOBILE NETWORK TRAFFIC COORDINATION ACROSS MULTIPLE APPLICATIONS[2018/48]
French:COORDINATION DE LA CIRCULATION DE RÉSEAU MOBILE À TRAVERS DE MULTIPLES APPLICATIONS[2018/48]
Examination procedure07.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/03]
07.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
25.09.2019Fee for grant paid
25.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.10.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
14.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11814939.2  / EP2599003
Divisional application(s)EP19201989.1
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
02.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
02.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
02.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
02.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2008008313  (FYKE STEVEN [CA]) [X] 1,3,6,11-13 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0058] * [Y] 7-10 [I] 2,4,5;
 [YA]US2009327390  (TRAN ANH P [US], et al) [Y] 7-10 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0032] * [A] 1-6,11-13