blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3388614

EP3388614 - TUBULAR MOTOR FOR A SHADING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.02.2020
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.04.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  14.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DELTA DORE RADEMACHER GmbH
Buschkamp 7
46414 Rhede / DE
[2024/21]
Former [2023/34]For all designated states
Rademacher Geräte-Elektronik GmbH
Buschkamp 7
46414 Rhede / DE
Former [2018/42]For all designated states
ARCA Beteiligungen GmbH
Buschkamp 7
46414 Rhede / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hirschfeld, Jörg
Espenweg 19
47665 Sonsbeck / DE
02 / Tepasse, Johannes
Am Wald 12
46414 Rhede / DE
 [2018/42]
Representative(s)Gottschald Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Klaus-Bungert-Straße 1
40468 Düsseldorf / DE
[2018/42]
Application number, filing date18163105.221.03.2018
[2018/42]
Priority number, dateDE201720102161U11.04.2017         Original published format: DE 202017102161 U
[2018/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3388614
Date:17.10.2018
Language:DE
[2018/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.2018
ClassificationIPC:E06B9/72, E06B9/88, H02P29/60, E06B9/68
[2018/42]
CPC:
E06B9/72 (EP); E06B9/88 (EP); H02P29/60 (EP);
E06B2009/6818 (EP); E06B2009/6872 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/22]
Former [2018/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ROHRMOTOR FÜR EINE VERDUNKELUNGSEINRICHTUNG[2018/42]
English:TUBULAR MOTOR FOR A SHADING DEVICE[2018/42]
French:MOTEUR TUBULAIRE POUR UN DISPOSITIF OCCULTEUR[2018/42]
Examination procedure17.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/22]
17.04.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.02.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.12.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2021Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
13.02.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.08.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
04.01.2022Request for further processing filed
04.01.2022Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.01.2022Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
25.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2025Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US6441353  (GEHRMANN WOLFGANG [DE], et al);
 [Y]EP1871970  (LUTRON ELECTRONICS CO [US]);
 [Y]US2015048772  (NAGATA YUICHI [JP], et al)
ExaminationDE9203945U
 EP1871970
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.