Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3392024

EP3392024 - MULTIFUNCTION END EFFECTOR APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR ASSEMBLING THERMOPLASTIC COMPOSITE ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.04.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[2018/43]
Inventor(s)01 / BLOCH, Daniel D.
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US
02 / WILKERSON, Randall D.
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US
03 / CARTER, Camille D.
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US
04 / GREEN, Zachary L.
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US
05 / WILLIAMS, Nicole R.
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US
06 / MOYES, Eric
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US
07 / HICKMAN, Gregory J.S.
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US
08 / MARTIN, Scott E.
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US
 [2018/43]
Representative(s)Lloyd, Robin , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2018/43]
Application number, filing date18163928.726.03.2018
[2018/43]
Priority number, dateUS20171548472111.04.2017         Original published format: US201715484721
[2018/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3392024
Date:24.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2018
ClassificationInternational:B29C65/08, B29C65/78, B32B37/06, B32B38/00, B25J15/00, B32B37/18, B32B38/18, B32B39/00, B29C69/00
[2018/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MULTIFUNKTIONALE ENDEFFEKTORVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE VON THERMOPLASTISCHEN VERBUNDARTIKELN[2018/43]
English:MULTIFUNCTION END EFFECTOR APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR ASSEMBLING THERMOPLASTIC COMPOSITE ARTICLES[2018/43]
French:APPAREIL EFFECTEUR D'EXTRÉMITÉ MULTIFONCTIONS ET PROCÉDÉS D'ASSEMBLAGE D'ARTICLES COMPOSITES THERMOPLASTIQUES[2018/43]
Examination procedure26.03.2018Examination requested  [2018/43]
26.03.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Documents cited:Search[IA]EP2647463  (EUROCOPTER DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [I] 1-8,10-12,14 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1-4 * [A] 9,13;
 [A]EP2845701  (DIEFFENBACHER GMBH MASCHINEN [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0047]; figure 3 *