Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3388569

EP3388569 - WASHING MACHINE AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.05.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
SEOUL
07336 / KR
[2018/42]
Inventor(s)01 / MOON, Byunghyun
LG Electronics Inc., IP Center
51, Gasan digital 1-ro
Geumcheon-gu
08592 Seoul / KR
02 / KWON, Oshin
LG Electronics Inc., IP Center
51, Gasan digital 1-ro
Geumcheon-gu
08592 Seoul / KR
 [2018/42]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2018/42]
Application number, filing date18166495.410.04.2018
[2018/42]
Priority number, dateKR2017004623510.04.2017         Original published format: KR 20170046235
[2018/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3388569
Date:17.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3388569
Date:04.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.2018
ClassificationInternational:D06F37/22
[2018/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/42]
TitleGerman:WASCHMASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DAVON[2018/42]
English:WASHING MACHINE AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING THE SAME[2018/42]
French:MACHINE À LAVER ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE[2018/42]
Examination procedure10.04.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/42]
07.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.09.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
09.09.2019Fee for grant paid
09.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19204546.6
Documents cited:Search[A]KR20130114478  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1, 3, 5-10 *;
 [A]US2012192362  (LEE DONG SOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0081] *;
 [A]US2013327099  (BAE IL SUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0125] *