Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3399841

EP3399841 - BUCK BOOST CONVERTER WITH IMPROVED THD BEHAVIOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  05.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 08.05.2019  [2019/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tridonic GmbH & Co. KG
Färbergasse 15
6851 Dornbirn / AT
[2018/45]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHÖNBERGER, John
Brügglistr. 50b
8852 Altendorf / CH
 [2018/45]
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2018/45]
Application number, filing date18166936.712.04.2018
[2018/45]
Priority number, dateDE201720102691U05.05.2017         Original published format: DE 202017102691 U
[2018/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3399841
Date:07.11.2018
Language:DE
[2018/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.2018
ClassificationInternational:H05B33/08
[2018/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/19]
Former [2018/45]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BUCK-BOOST-KONVERTER MIT VERBESSERTEM THD-VERHALTEN[2018/45]
English:BUCK BOOST CONVERTER WITH IMPROVED THD BEHAVIOR[2018/45]
French:CONVERTISSEUR DÉVOLTEUR-SURVOLTEUR À COMPORTEMENT THD AMÉLIORÉ[2018/45]
Examination procedure28.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/19]
28.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[XYI]WO2004100614  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6 * figure 1 * [Y] 4 [I] 2,7;
 [XY]DE102013215966  (TRIDONIC GMBH & CO KG [AT]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * paragraphs [0047] - [0050] - [0061]; figures 1-4; claim 2 * [Y] 4;
 [X]US7498786  (PRINZ FRANCOIS X [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7 * figure 1c *;
 [X]  - Robert Sheehan ET AL, "Switch-mode power converter compensation made easy", Texas Instruments Power Supply Design Seminar 2016/ 2017, (20160901), pages 1 - 38, URL: https://www.ti.com/seclit/ml/slup340/slup340.pdf, (20180621), XP055486626 [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [Introduction] , [phase and gain] - [margin definitions]; figures 16,18,38,42 *
 [XY]  - KA-FAI CHAN ET AL, "Generalized Type III controller design interface for DC-DC converters", 2013 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF IEEE REGION 10 (TENCON 2013), IEEE, doi:10.1109/TENCON.2015.7373052, ISSN 2159-3442, ISBN 978-1-4799-2825-5, (20151101), pages 1 - 6, (20160105), XP032845164 [X] 1-3,5-7 * figures 6b, 7 * [Y] 4

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TENCON.2015.7373052