blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3388607

EP3388607 - SECURITY DOOR WITH A MODULAR DOOR MOVEMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD OF OPERATION FOR RELIABLE CLOSING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.02.2021
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.04.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  14.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 17.08.2022  [2022/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Advanced Pneumatic Marine GmbH
Weddernkamp 6
23858 Reinfeld / DE
[2018/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Armbrecht, Björn Helge
Ahornweg 3
22941 Bargteheide / DE
 [2018/42]
Representative(s)Leonhard, Frank Reimund
Leonhard & Partner
Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 09 62
80083 München / DE
[2018/42]
Application number, filing date18167218.913.04.2018
[2018/42]
Priority number, dateDE20171010812413.04.2017         Original published format: DE102017108124
DE20181010242904.02.2018         Original published format: DE102018102429
[2018/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3388607
Date:17.10.2018
Language:DE
[2018/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3388607
Date:25.03.2020
Language:DE
[2020/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.2018
ClassificationIPC:E05F15/53, E05F15/72, B63B43/00, E05F15/56
[2018/42]
CPC:
E05F15/72 (EP); E05F15/56 (EP); B63B2019/0053 (EP);
E05F15/40 (EP); E05Y2201/41 (EP); E05Y2201/448 (EP);
E05Y2400/3013 (EP); E05Y2400/512 (EP); E05Y2400/61 (EP);
E05Y2400/612 (EP); E05Y2400/80 (EP); E05Y2400/822 (EP);
E05Y2800/25 (EP); E05Y2800/428 (EP); E05Y2900/514 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/22]
Former [2018/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SICHERHEITSTÜR MIT MODULAR AUFGEBAUTEM TÜRBEWEGUNGSSYSTEM UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN ZUM ZUVERLÄSSIGEN VERSCHLIESSEN[2018/42]
English:SECURITY DOOR WITH A MODULAR DOOR MOVEMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD OF OPERATION FOR RELIABLE CLOSING[2018/42]
French:PORTE DE SÉCURITÉ POURVUE D'UN SYSTÈME DE MOUVEMENT DE LA PORTE MODULAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT DESTINÉ À LA FERMETURE FIABLE[2018/42]
Examination procedure17.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/22]
17.04.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.2020Fee for grant paid
09.02.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.02.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)12.01.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.04.2018
AL25.03.2020
CY25.03.2020
CZ25.03.2020
DK25.03.2020
EE25.03.2020
ES25.03.2020
FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
IT25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
MC25.03.2020
MK25.03.2020
MT25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
PL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SI25.03.2020
SK25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
TR25.03.2020
IE13.04.2020
LU13.04.2020
BE30.04.2020
FR25.05.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
[2022/31]
Former [2022/30]HU13.04.2018
AL25.03.2020
CY25.03.2020
CZ25.03.2020
DK25.03.2020
EE25.03.2020
ES25.03.2020
FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
IT25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
MC25.03.2020
MT25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
PL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SI25.03.2020
SK25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
TR25.03.2020
IE13.04.2020
LU13.04.2020
BE30.04.2020
FR25.05.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
Former [2022/27]HU13.04.2018
CY25.03.2020
CZ25.03.2020
DK25.03.2020
EE25.03.2020
ES25.03.2020
FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
IT25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
MC25.03.2020
MT25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
PL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SI25.03.2020
SK25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
TR25.03.2020
IE13.04.2020
LU13.04.2020
BE30.04.2020
FR25.05.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
Former [2021/23]CZ25.03.2020
DK25.03.2020
EE25.03.2020
ES25.03.2020
FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
IT25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
MC25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
PL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SI25.03.2020
SK25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
IE13.04.2020
LU13.04.2020
BE30.04.2020
FR25.05.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
Former [2021/20]CZ25.03.2020
DK25.03.2020
EE25.03.2020
ES25.03.2020
FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
IT25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
MC25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
PL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SK25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
IE13.04.2020
LU13.04.2020
BE30.04.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
Former [2021/10]CZ25.03.2020
DK25.03.2020
EE25.03.2020
ES25.03.2020
FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
IT25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
MC25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
PL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SK25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
LU13.04.2020
BE30.04.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
Former [2021/09]CZ25.03.2020
DK25.03.2020
EE25.03.2020
ES25.03.2020
FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
IT25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
MC25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SK25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
LU13.04.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
Former [2021/08]CZ25.03.2020
DK25.03.2020
EE25.03.2020
ES25.03.2020
FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
MC25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SK25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
LU13.04.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
Former [2021/04]CZ25.03.2020
EE25.03.2020
FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
MC25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SK25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
Former [2020/50]CZ25.03.2020
EE25.03.2020
FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SK25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
Former [2020/49]CZ25.03.2020
FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SK25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
Former [2020/48]FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
RO25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
SM25.03.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
PT18.08.2020
Former [2020/47]FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
LT25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
Former [2020/46]FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
IS25.07.2020
Former [2020/45]FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
NL25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
Former [2020/39]FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
BG25.06.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
Former [2020/38]FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
NO25.06.2020
GR26.06.2020
Former [2020/37]FI25.03.2020
HR25.03.2020
LV25.03.2020
RS25.03.2020
SE25.03.2020
NO25.06.2020
Former [2020/35]FI25.03.2020
NO25.06.2020
Documents cited:Search[I]US2741477  (JEAN MERCIER);
 [XY]US2874958  (JEAN MERCIER);
 [Y]DE3021724  (ALTROGGE WILHELM E DR ING [DE]);
 [XYI]EP2400104  (HOERMANN KG [DE]);
 [Y]US2012255232  (GAYHART GARY [US]);
 [A]US2012272576  (VAN TASSELL III RONALD E [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.