Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3369806

EP3369806 - KOJI FERMENTED COMPOSITION BASED ON TEA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kirishima Highland Beer Co., Ltd.
876-15 Fumoto
Mizobe-cho
Kirishima-shi, Kagoshima 899-6404 / JP
[2018/36]
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAMOTO, Masahiro
c/o Genkoji Research Institute Co. Ltd.
876-15 Mizobechofumoto
Kirishima-shi, Kagoshima 899-6404 / JP
 [2018/36]
Representative(s)Green, Mark Charles
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Euston House
24 Eversholt Street
London NW1 1AD / GB
[2018/36]
Application number, filing date18167269.229.01.2015
[2018/36]
Priority number, dateJP2014002326310.02.2014         Original published format: JP 2014023263
[2018/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3369806
Date:05.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:C12N1/14, A23L27/00, A23L27/20, C12R1/665, A23L33/105
[2018/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/36]
TitleGerman:FERMENTIERTE KOJIZUSAMMENSETZUNG BASIEREND AUF TEE[2018/36]
English:KOJI FERMENTED COMPOSITION BASED ON TEA[2018/36]
French:COMPOSITION DE KOJI FERMENTÉE A BASE DE THÉ[2018/36]
Examination procedure06.03.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/33]
26.03.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2019/33]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15745759.9  / EP3109316
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201905   M06   Not yet paid